Huston v. Takeda Pharmaceutical Co Ltd et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Rebecca F Doherty |
Referred: | Patrick J Hanna |
Case #: | 6:17-mc-00051 |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Judgment Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Sealed Motion
Fri 03/31 2:20 PM
JUDGMENT ADOPTING2 Report and Recommendations. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the1 Motion to Approve Settlement is hereby GRANTED pursuant to the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Hanna, which is hereby adopted. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 3/31/2017. (crt,Guidry, C) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Report and Recommendations
Thu 03/16 3:53 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 SEALED MOTION Approving Settlement Amount, Contingency Fee and Advanced Costs filed by Brandy Angelee Huston. This Court having considered all submissions made, I recommend to the Court that the Motion be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 3/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/16/2017. (crt,Alexander, E) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Sealed Motion (Sealed Pleading)
Mon 03/13 3:16 PM
SEALED MOTION Approving Settlement Amount, Contingency Fee and Advanced Costs by Brandy Angelee Huston.(Attorney Patrick C Morrow added to party Brandy Angelee Huston(pty:pla))(aty,Morrow, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Attorney Verification, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
misc
Electronic Payment of Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee
Mon 03/13 3:17 PM
ELECTRONIC PAYMENT of Miscellaneous Case filing fee by Brandy Angelee Huston. ( Filing Fee: $47, receipt number 0536-3312649) . (aty,Morrow, Patrick) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/14 11:33 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Rebecca F Doherty and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Williams, L) |