BuilderTrend Solutions, Inc. v. VBConversions, LLC
Nebraska District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph F Bataillon |
Referred: | Susan M Bazis |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00079 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 5:00 AM CDT |
Defendant
VBConversions, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BuilderTrend Solutions, Inc.
a Nebraska Corporation 11718 Nicholas Street
Omaha, NE 68154 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
oth_evt
Report regarding Copyright
Tue 10/03 8:50 AM
REPORT on the determination of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (original form mailed to the Office of Register of Copyrights with a copy of order17 ). (ADB) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District
Tue 10/03 8:32 AM
Case transferred to Central District of California. Original electronic file sent. (ADB, ) |
||
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
18
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 08/30 5:04 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Case No. 8:17CV79 and Case No. 8:17CV195 are hereby consolidated for all purposes. Defendant VBConversions, LLC's motion to dismiss or transfer in Case No. 8:17CV79, Filing No. 10, is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this Memorandum and Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer these consolidated actions to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
oth_doc
Index
Wed 06/21 5:11 PM
INDEX in support of Reply Brief,15 by Attorney Donald M. Gindy on behalf of Defendant VBConversions, LLC.(Gindy, Donald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H | ||
15 | 15
oth_doc
Reply Brief
Wed 06/21 4:56 PM
REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss or In The Alternative, Transfer the Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) To the Central District of California 10 by Attorney Donald M. Gindy on behalf of Defendant VBConversions, LLC.(Gindy, Donald) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
oth_doc
Index
Wed 06/14 1:59 PM
INDEX in support of Brief,13 by Attorney David S. Houghton on behalf of Plaintiff BuilderTrend Solutions, Inc..(Houghton, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D | ||
13 | 13
oth_doc
Brief
Wed 06/14 1:55 PM
BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss or In The Alternative, Transfer the Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) To the Central District of California 10 by Attorney David S. Houghton on behalf of Plaintiff BuilderTrend Solutions, Inc..(Houghton, David) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
oth_doc
Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1
Wed 05/24 5:12 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Donald M. Gindy on behalf of Defendant VBConversions, LLC.(Gindy, Donald) |
|
11 | 11
oth_doc
Brief
Wed 05/24 2:59 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss or In The Alternative, Transfer the Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) To the Central District of California 10 by Attorney Donald M. Gindy on behalf of Defendant VBConversions, LLC.(Gindy, Donald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Affidavit Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Affidavit Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Index of Evidence | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss
Wed 05/24 2:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss or In The Alternative, Transfer the Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) To the Central District of California by Attorney Donald M. Gindy on behalf of Defendant VBConversions, LLC.(Gindy, Donald) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/24 7:50 AM
TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant VBConversions, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Application/Order Pro Hac Vice
Tue 05/23 8:32 AM
APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Donald M. Gindy for Defendant VBConversions, LLC. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KLF) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/17 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Edward D. Hotz on behalf of Defendant VBConversions, LLC (Hotz, Edward) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 03/27 3:56 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant VBConversions, LLC. Waiver sent on 3/27/2017. (Houghton, David) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
oth_doc
Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1
Wed 03/15 1:39 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney David S. Houghton on behalf of Plaintiff BuilderTrend Solutions, Inc..(Houghton, David) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/14 8:42 AM
TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff BuilderTrend. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(GJG) |
|
3 | 3
oth_evt
Report regarding Copyright
Tue 03/14 8:41 AM
REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (original form mailed to the Office of Register with a copy of complaint.) (GJG) |
|
2 | 2
oth_evt
Assignment of Judges
Tue 03/14 8:15 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (GJG) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 5:16 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against VBConversions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0867-3406386), by Attorney David S. Houghton on behalf of BuilderTrend(Houghton, David) |