Criado v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Lou Robinson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00049 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 4:55 AM CDT |
Defendant
Lowe's Home Centers LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Criado
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Mediator
ADR Provider
Terminated: 08/14/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Thu 09/07 5:01 PM
ORDER -- On September 6, 2017, the parties filed a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal voluntarily dismissing all claims in controversy in the above-captioned case. This motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, the claims between Plaintiff and Defendant are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 9/7/2017) (awc) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation
Wed 09/06 8:51 AM
AGREED Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Jennifer Criado, Lowe's Home Centers LLC. Added filer on 9/6/2017 (daa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Tue 08/15 12:08 PM
ORDER: On August 14, 2017, the Court received an ADR Summary Report informing the Court that the parties have settled all disputes in the above-captioned case. Accordingly, all pending motions are moot and will not be ruled upon by the Court. The Clerk will terminate all pending motions. Any party wishing to reurge any motion must promptly so inform the Court. The parties are ordered to file an agreed stipulation of dismissal within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 8/15/2017) (daa) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
adr
ADR Summary
Mon 08/14 10:02 AM
Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by ADR Provider. Attorneys in Attendance: Jennie Knapp, Ed McConnell, Krishna Reddy. Prv Fee: $ 1125.00. Outcome of ADR: Settled as a result of ADR. (Simpson, John) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 07/20 11:29 AM
ANSWER to17 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 06/28 5:32 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lowe's Home Centers LLC filed by Jennifer Criado. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (awc) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Wed 06/28 5:29 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Amend Pleadings. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 6/28/2017) (awc) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 06/27 1:20 PM
Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Pleadings filed by Jennifer Criado (McConnell, Ed) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) | ||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Settlement Conference Report
Fri 06/09 10:23 AM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REPORT filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 06/02 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Defendant Designation of Expert and Fact Witnesses filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
trial
Designation of Experts
Wed 05/10 4:48 PM
Designation of Experts by Jennifer Criado. (McConnell, Ed) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status Report
Mon 04/03 4:50 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Jennifer Criado. (McConnell, Ed) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 03/21 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennie Christine Knapp on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Knapp, Jennie) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Fri 03/17 2:46 PM
ORDER: Although the parties have consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case will be tried to the District Court. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 3/17/2017) (daa) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/16 4:33 PM
ORDER granting4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul Garcia. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 3/16/2017) (daa) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/16 4:32 PM
ORDER granting3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Krishna Reddy. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 3/16/2017) (daa) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 03/15 3:28 PM
ORIGINAL RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties shall be ready for trial by 11/20/2017. Counsel shall file a joint report setting forth the status of settlement negotiations by 6/26/2017. Discovery due by 9/18/2017. Pretrial Materials (designation of expert witnesses) due by 5/22/2017 by parties seeking affirmative relief and due by 6/12/2017 by parties opposing affirmative relief. Joinder of Parties due by 5/1/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 9/11/2017. Motions for summary judgment due by 9/18/2017. All other motions except motions in limine due by 10/16/2017. Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures due by 11/6/2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 3/15/2017) (djs) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
qcref
Robinson
Tue 03/14 8:43 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Robinson. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (vls) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/13 3:05 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Paul Garcia (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8272021) filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Amendment | ||
3 | 3
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/13 3:01 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8272008) filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/13 2:34 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/13 2:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from RANDALL COUNTY, case number 71554A filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8271778) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Supplement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) F |