|
GPO
Jun 29 2017
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should deny Plaintiff Barbara A. Adamss Motion to Remand Removed Action Dkt. No. 8 and dismiss Ms. Adamss claims against Defendant Cheldan Home, L.P. without prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 6/29/2017) (chmb)
|
|
GPO
Jul 19 2017
Order Accepting 29 Findings and Recommendations on Motion re: 8 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Barbara A Adams. The Court DENIES Plaintiff Barbara A. Adams's 8 Motion to Remand Removed Action, and her claims against Defendant Cheldan Homes, L.P. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/19/2017) (epm)
|
|
GPO
Sep 01 2017
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should grant Defendant Guild Mortgage Company's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 5] and dismiss Plaintiff Barbara Adams's claim against Defendant Guild Mortgage Company for breach of fiduciary duty without prejudice. The Court should grant Ms. Adams 21 days from the date of any order adopting these Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation in which to file an amended complaint consistent with this recommendation and the conclusions and findings above and should order that, if she fails to do so, her claim against Defendant Guild Mortgage Company for breach of fiduciary duty will be dismissed with prejudice without further notice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/1/2017) (mcrd)
|
|
GPO
Oct 04 2017
ORDER ACCEPTING 37 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/4/2017) (aaa)
|
|
GPO
Oct 11 2017
AMENDED ORDER ACCEPTING 37 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Because the Court is granting leave to replead, the Judgment entered on 10/4/2017 [Dkt. No. 40 is VACATED as premature. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/11/2017) (aaa)
|
|
GPO
Dec 04 2017
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should grant Defendant U.S. Bank National Association's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 34] and dismiss Plaintiff Barbara Adams's claim against Defendant U.S. Bank National Association for violations of the Property Code with prejudice and her claims against Defendant U.S. Bank National Association for breach of contract, violations of the TDCA, and declaratory and injunctive relief without prejudice. The Court should grant Ms. Adams 21 days from the date of any order adopting these Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation in which to file an amended complaint consistent with this recommendation and the conclusions and findings above and should order that, if she fails to do so, all of her claims against Defendant U.S. Bank National Association will be dismissed with prejudice without further notice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 12/4/2017) (mcrd)
|
|
GPO
Jan 03 2018
Order Accepting 46 Findings and Recommendations re: 34 Motion to Dismiss filed by US Bank National Association. Defendant U.S. Bank National Association's Motion to Dismiss 34 is GRANTED. Plaintiff Barbara Adams's claim against Defendant U.S. Bank National Association for violations of the Property Code is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and her claims against Defendant U.S. Bank National Association for breach of contract, violations of the TDCA, and declaratory and injunctive relief are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with leave to replead those claims within 21 days of the date of this order. If she fails to do so, all of her claims against Defendant U.S. Bank National Association will be dismissed with prejudice without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 01/03/2018) (epm)
|
|
GPO
Mar 06 2018
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should grant Defendant Guild Mortgage Company's Second Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 44] and dismiss Plaintiff Barbara Adams's breach of fiduciary duty claim against Defendant Guild Mortgage Company with prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 3/6/2018) (mcrd)
|
|
GPO
Apr 18 2018
65 replaced on 4/18/2018) (mcrd).FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: For the reasons explained above, the Court should grant Defendant U.S. Bank National Association's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 55] and dismiss Plaintiff Barbara Adams's claims against Defendant U.S. Bank National Association for breach of contract, violations of the TDCA, and declaratory and injunctive relief with prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/18/2018) (chmb) (Main Document
|
|
GPO
May 10 2018
WITH PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/10/2018) (zkc) Order Accepting 62 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge; granting 44 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff Barbara A. Adams's breach of fiduciary claim against Defendant Guild Mortgage Company is DISMISSED
|
|
GPO
May 10 2018
ct, violations of the TDCA, and declaratory and injunctive relief are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/10/2018) (zkc) Order Accepting 65 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge; granting 55 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff Barbara A. Adams's claims against Defendant U.S. Bank National Association for breach of contra
|