Talley v. Dallas County Jail
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Barbara Mg Lynn |
Referred: | David L Horan |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00724 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2018 |
Defendant
Dallas County Jail
|
|
Plaintiff
Chelsea Lee Talley
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment
Thu 03/29 5:06 PM
JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/29/2018) (epm) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Thu 03/29 5:01 PM
Order Accepting10 Findings and Recommendations on Case re:3 Complaint, filed by Chelsea Lee Talley. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/29/2018) (epm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 03/29 5:06 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11,12. Thu Mar 29 17:06:36 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 03/12 9:02 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Mon Mar 12 09:02:19 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Mon 03/12 9:01 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should summarily dismiss this action with prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 3/9/2018) (axm) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Mail Returned
Mon 05/15 4:30 PM
Mail returned as undeliverable.6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, received back from Chelsea Lee Talley as not in Dallas County Jail. Address updated from last filed document,7 . New address: 8301 Bruton Rd Dallas, TX 75217. The current document has been re-mailed. (axm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 05/15 4:30 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. remailed Mon May 15 16:30:54 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
utility
Mail Returned
Tue 05/09 11:22 AM
Mail returned as undeliverable.6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, received back from Dallas County Jail-Inmate Trust Fund Dept as RTS-Not in Dallas County Jail. (epm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 05/09 11:22 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6 . Tue May 9 11:22:58 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 04/25 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Chelsea Lee Talley. New address: 8301 Bruton Rd Dallas, TX 75217. (epm) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/11 11:45 AM
FILING FEE ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/11/2017) (axm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 04/11 11:48 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. mailed to Inmate Trust Fund Department Tue Apr 11 11:48:48 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/10 12:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Chelsea Lee Talley. (axm) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order And Notice of Deficiency
Fri 03/17 10:00 AM
Order and Notice of Deficiency: Chelsea Lee Talley must address the following deficiency: Plaintiff Chelsea Lee Talley has neither filed with her complaint a motion to proceed in forma pauperis nor paid the full filing fee. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 4/17/2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 3/17/2017) (sss) |
|
Att: 1 IFP Form | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 03/17 10:00 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Fri Mar 17 10:00:46 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 5:04 PM
COMPLAINT against Dallas County Jail filed by Chelsea Lee Talley. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Mon 03/13 5:03 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ykp) |
|
1 | 1
qcref
Lynn
Mon 03/13 5:03 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 03/13 5:05 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Mon Mar 13 17:05:14 CDT 2017 (crt) |