Colony Insurance Company v. T C O P S Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | A Joe Fish |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00725 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 5:27 AM CDT |
Defendant
Timothy Hankins
TDCJ Jordan Unit 1992 Hilton Rd
Pampa, TX 79065 |
|
Plaintiff
Colony Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
T C O P S Inc
Terminated: 05/25/2017
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment - Default
Wed 06/14 2:29 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST TIMOTHY HANKINS: It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that plaintiff's motion for default judgment against Timothy Hankins is hereby GRANTED. It is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Colony Insurance Company's policy 103 GL 0004212-00 provides no coverage against the claims asserted in the underlying litigation styled Hankins v. Wesley Dean Cordell, et al., No. CC 15-03836 A, in the County Court at Law No. 1 of Dallas County and that Colony Insurance Company has no duty to defend or indemnify against those claims. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/14/2017) (ykp) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 06/12 4:23 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Timothy Hankins filed by Colony Insurance Company (Melendi, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) B-1 | ||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Clerk's Entry of Default
Fri 06/09 1:50 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Timothy Hankins. |
|
12 | 12
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 06/09 1:32 PM
Combined Request for Clerks Entry of Default and MOTION for Default Judgment against Timothy Hankins filed by Colony Insurance Company (Melendi, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) B-1 | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Judgment
Thu 05/25 4:51 PM
AGREED JUDGMENT: The plaintiff Colony Insurance Company's and the defendant T.C.O.P.S.'s joint motion for entry of agreed judgment (docket entry10 ) is GRANTED, with each party to bear its own costs. The Colony Insurance Company policy bearing number 103 GL 0004212-00 and effective May 16, 2014 to May 16, 2015, provides no coverage for T.C.O.P.S. against the claims raised in the case styled Timothy Hankins v. Wesley Dean Cordell, et al., No. CC- 15-03836 A, in County Court at Law No. 1 of Dallas County, Texas; and Colony has no duty to defend or indemnify T.C.O.P.S. for those claims. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 5/25/2017) (sss) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Judgment
Thu 05/25 12:34 PM
Joint MOTION for Judgment For Entry of Agreed Judgment filed by Colony Insurance Company (Melendi, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Agreed Judgment | ||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned
Fri 05/12 4:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Colony Insurance Company; served on 5/10/2017. |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned
Thu 05/11 2:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to T C O P S Inc; served on 5/9/2017. (aaa) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/20 5:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Colony Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Argo Group International Holdings, Ltd. for Colony Insurance Company. (Melendi, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Thu 03/16 4:44 PM
ORDER: No later than 20 days after this order is filed, plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/16/2017) (chmb) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/13 2:46 PM
Summons Issued as to Timothy Hankins, T C O P S Inc. (ndt) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) | ||
4 | 4
qcref
Fish
Mon 03/13 2:39 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Mon 03/13 2:04 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Colony Insurance Company. (Melendi, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Mon 03/13 2:01 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Colony Insurance Company. (Melendi, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 1:49 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Colony Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8271667) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Melendi, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |