Sheridan et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | David C Godbey |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00730 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 5:32 AM CDT |
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank NA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CCS Asset Management, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Sheridan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Sheridan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert L. Sheridan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 04/27 1:53 PM
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE granting18 Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice. All costs, expenses, and attorney fees are taxed against the party incurring same. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/27/2018) (zkc) |
|
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss
Thu 04/26 2:58 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA (Hard-Wilson, Brenda) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 19, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 02/19 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hard-Wilson, Brenda) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 09/05 5:00 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting13 Motion for leave to proceed without local counsel. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/5/2017) (chmb) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/05 4:50 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Darwin McKee. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/5/2017) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/30 3:59 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Darwin McKee (Filing fee $25; Receipt number DS0102441) filed by CCS Asset Management, Inc., Anthony Sheridan, Linda Sheridan, Robert L. Sheridan. (aaa) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Leave to File
Tue 08/29 3:16 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Anthony Sheridan (McKee, Darwin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Thu 08/03 3:54 PM
ORDER: Counsel has thirty (30) days to be admitted to the Northern District or file an application for admission pro hac vice. Counsel also has thirty (30) days to file a motion to proceed without local counsel. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/3/2017) (sss) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 07/21 2:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for Court's one-week docket beginning 5/7/2018 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/21/2017) (sss) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Remand
Tue 07/18 12:05 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot7 Motion to Remand per counsel. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/18/2017) (chmb) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 05/02 1:20 PM
OBJECTION filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA re:7 MOTION to Remand (LeBoeuf, Jason) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Remand
Mon 04/17 4:58 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot6 Motion to Remand per7 Revised Motion to Remand. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/17/2017) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Remand
Thu 04/13 1:07 PM
MOTION to Remand filed by Anthony Sheridan (McKee, Darwin) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Remand
Wed 04/12 4:56 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Anthony Sheridan (McKee, Darwin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Status Report
Tue 04/11 4:24 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (LeBoeuf, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
qcref
Godbey
Tue 03/14 12:30 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (svc) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order
Tue 03/14 11:42 AM
ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order regarding the following matters, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/14/2017) (twd) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/13 4:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (LeBoeuf, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/13 4:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 391st District Court of Tom Green County, case number 170047C filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8272293) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (LeBoeuf, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A (Index of Exhibits), | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Cover Sheet Supplement Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D (state court docket), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E (petition), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F (injunction affidavit), | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) G (signed TRO), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) H (injunction bond), | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) I (unsigned temporary injunction), | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) J (answer), | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) K (Tom Green County Appraisal District valuation) |