2012 Properties, LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | John Mcbryde |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00221 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 5:06 AM CDT |
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank NA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
2012 Properties LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Judgment
Tue 04/25 3:43 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT...Claims of plaintiff against defendant are dismissed w/prej. Each party bear costs. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 4/25/2017) (wrb) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order
Tue 04/25 3:39 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE...all claims Plaintiff asserted against Defendant are dismissed w/prej; all costs taxed against party incurring. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 4/25/2017) (wrb) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss
Tue 04/25 3:09 PM
JOINT MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by 2012 Properties, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank NA (wrb) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Thu 04/13 3:23 PM
ORDER FOR REPLEADING...By Apr 26 2017 pltf file an amended pleading to be titled "Plaintiff's Amended Complaint", by May 10 2017, deft file an answer or other response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 4/13/2017) (wrb) |
|
order
~Util Super U
Thu 04/13 3:24 PM
Amended Complaint due from Plaintiff by 4/26/2017. Responses due by 5/10/2017. (wrb) |
||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/16 11:05 AM
Originals and Judge's Copies received pursuant to standing order re:1 Notice of Removal filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (wrb) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) Disclosure, | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s) COIP | ||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Paper Case Designation Order
Tue 03/14 8:21 AM
Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 3/14/2017) (wrb) |
|
4 | 4
qcref
McBryde
Tue 03/14 8:20 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/13 5:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McDougal, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/13 5:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McDougal, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/13 4:59 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 96th Judicial District Court of Tarrant County, Texas, case number 096-290288-17 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8272625) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (McDougal, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Index of Matters Being Filed, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B - Civil Cover Sheet and Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C - State Court Actions Docket Transactions Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) C-1 - Orginal Petition and Application for TRO, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) C-2 - Temporary Restraining Order, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) C-3 - TRO Citation and Return of Service, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) C-4 - Defendant's Original Answer, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) D - Tarrant County Appraisal District Property Valuation |