Lynn v. Cooke et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Case #: | 7:17-cv-00026 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 04/27 10:05 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9, 10. Thu Apr 27 10:05:44 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Judgment
Thu 04/27 10:05 AM
JUDGMENT: This action came on for consideration by the Court, and the issues having been duly considered and a decision duly rendered, It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) as frivolous. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/26/2017) (skg) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous
Thu 04/27 10:03 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) as frivolous. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/26/2017) (skg) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Fri 03/31 3:32 PM
Brief in Support filed by Sean Carey Lynn re7 MOTION. (skg) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 03/31 3:30 PM
"MOTION Requesting Conference" filed by Sean Carey Lynn. (skg) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Produce
Fri 03/31 3:27 PM
"MOTION to Produce Documents" filed by Sean Carey Lynn. (skg) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order For Partial Filing Fee
Thu 03/16 2:28 PM
Order For Partial Filing Fee in amount of $0 with a balance of $350 remaining. (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/16/2017) (skg) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 03/16 2:28 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Thu Mar 16 14:28:27 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Mon 03/13 10:28 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (skg) |
|
3 | 3
qcref
O' Connor (WICHITA FALLS CASES)
Mon 03/13 10:28 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (skg) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/13 10:27 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Sean Carey Lynn. (skg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Sean Carey Lynn. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (skg) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 03/13 10:29 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3, 4. Mon Mar 13 10:29:37 CDT 2017 (crt) |