Coreas v. Scenic PG, LLC, d/b/a Scenic Property Group et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Lee Yeakel |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00229 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 14, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 4:33 AM CDT |
Defendant
Joel M. Melrose
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scenic PG, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard S. Singleton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yadira Sanchez Coreas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
order
Judgment
Thu 02/14 11:26 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) |
|
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 02/14 11:24 AM
ORDER on Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) |
|
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 02/13 12:16 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Yadira Sanchez Coreas.(Scalise, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
adr
ADR Report Filed - Consent to Alternate Dispute Resolution
Wed 07/25 9:17 AM
AMENDED Joint ADR Report Filed - CONSENT to Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) by Yadira Sanchez Coreas(Scalise, Charles) Modified on 7/25/2018 (lt) |
|
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
adr
ADR Report - Other
Tue 07/24 3:31 PM
ADR Report Filed - by Yadira Sanchez Coreas(Scalise, Charles) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 01/04 11:43 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER:Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2019 at 09:00 AM and Jury Trial in the month of April 2019 before Judge Lee Yeakel, ADR Report Deadline due by 7/1/2018, Discovery due by 7/1/2018, Motions due by 8/1/2018,. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) |
|
18 | 18
minutes
Pretrial Conference
Wed 01/03 4:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/3/2018 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(dm) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 12/27 9:08 AM
ORDER GRANTING16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert E. Bone. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 12/21 3:46 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert D. O'Conor ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10299714) by on behalf of Scenic PG, LLC.(O'Conor, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order | ||
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 11/29 11:55 AM
ORDER, (Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Thu 11/09 10:28 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Yadira Sanchez Coreas. (Scalise, Charles) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 07/10 10:36 AM
ORDER DENYING9 Motion for Rule 12(e); DISMISSING11 Motion for Relief from Notice of Default. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (ml) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 06/19 12:50 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yadira Sanchez Coreas, re9 CORRECTED MOTION Rule 12(e) Motion re8 Deficiency Notice,7 Answer to Complaint, filed by Defendant Scenic PG, LLC, Defendant Joel M. Melrose, Defendant Richard S. Singleton(Scalise, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 06/12 3:42 PM
MOTION for Relief from Notice of Default, If Any re7 Answer to Complaint, by Joel M. Melrose, Scenic PG, LLC, Richard S. Singleton.(O'Conor, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/12 11:40 AM
Corrected ANSWER to1 Complaint by Joel M. Melrose, Scenic PG, LLC, Richard S. Singleton.(O'Conor, Robert) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 06/12 11:37 AM
CORRECTED MOTION Rule 12(e) Motion re8 Deficiency Notice,7 Answer to Complaint, by Joel M. Melrose, Scenic PG, LLC, Richard S. Singleton.(O'Conor, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order | ||
8 | 8
notice
Deficiency Notice
Mon 06/12 9:09 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: for Robert D. O'Conor re 7 Answer to Complaint. (ml) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/09 2:43 PM
Defendants' Rule 12(e) Motion and ANSWER to1 Complaint . Attorney Robert D. O'Conor added to party Joel M. Melrose(pty:dft), Attorney Robert D. O'Conor added to party Scenic PG, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert D. O'Conor added to party Richard S. Singleton(pty:dft) by Joel M. Melrose, Scenic PG, LLC, Richard S. Singleton.(O'Conor, Robert) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/25 8:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yadira Sanchez Coreas. Joel M. Melrose served on 5/19/2017, answer due 6/9/2017. (Scalise, Charles) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 05/22 2:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yadira Sanchez Coreas. Scenic PG, LLC served on 5/19/2017, answer due 6/9/2017; Richard S. Singleton served on 5/19/2017, answer due 6/9/2017.(Scalise, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement | ||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/13 3:54 PM
Summons Issued as to Joel M. Melrose, Scenic PG, LLC, and Richard S. Singleton. (gr) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 03/13 1:52 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Yadira Sanchez Coreas.(Scalise, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Mon 03/13 1:51 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Yadira Sanchez Coreas. (Scalise, Charles) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 1:50 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9386253), filed by Yadira Sanchez Coreas.(Scalise, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/13 3:53 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (gr) |