Hyper Wear, Inc. v. Fitness 75247, Inc. et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert Pitman |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00230 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 4:08 AM CDT |
Defendant
Fitness 75247, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fitness 77041, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fitness Depot, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hyper Wear, Inc.
2120 Denton Drive, Suite 101
Austin, TX 78758 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120)
Wed 02/14 9:18 AM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (klw) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 09/06 4:21 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (ml) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice
Wed 08/30 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Dismissal by Hyper Wear, Inc. (Gray, Joseph) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 08/28 6:29 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Fitness 75247, Inc., Fitness 77041, Inc., Fitness Depot, Inc..(Schultz, George) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 08/14 10:08 AM
Text Order GRANTING14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants Fitness 75247, Inc., Fitness 77041, Inc., and Fitness Depot, Inc. shall have through and including August 28, 2017 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Mon 08/14 4:09 PM
Reset Deadlines: Fitness 75247, Inc. answer due 8/28/2017; Fitness 77041, Inc. answer due 8/28/2017; Fitness Depot, Inc. answer due 8/28/2017. (ml) |
||
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 08/11 4:09 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Fitness 75247, Inc., Fitness 77041, Inc., Fitness Depot, Inc..(Schultz, George) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 07/31 5:27 PM
Text Order GRANTING13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants' answer or otherwise responsive filing is due on or before August 14, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Tue 08/01 9:00 AM
Reset Deadlines: Fitness 75247, Inc. answer due 8/14/2017; Fitness 77041, Inc. answer due 8/14/2017; Fitness Depot, Inc. answer due 8/14/2017. (ml) |
||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 07/28 4:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Fitness 75247, Inc., Fitness 77041, Inc., Fitness Depot, Inc..(Schultz, George) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 07/05 5:51 PM
Text Order GRANTING11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants Fitness 75247, Inc., Fitness 77041, Inc., and Fitness Depot, Inc.'s Answer or otherwise responsive filing is due on or before July 31, 2017.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Thu 07/06 8:11 AM
Reset Deadlines: Fitness 75247, Inc. answer due 7/31/2017; Fitness 77041, Inc. answer due 7/31/2017; Fitness Depot, Inc. answer due 7/31/2017. (ml) |
||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Fri 06/30 9:54 AM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fitness Depot, Inc.. (Schultz, George) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 06/30 9:52 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Fitness 75247, Inc., Fitness 77041, Inc., Fitness Depot, Inc..(Schultz, George) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 05/31 1:13 PM
Text Order GRANTING9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants Fitness 75247, Inc. and Fitness 77041, Inc.'s Answer or otherwise responsive pleading is due on or before June 30, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Wed 05/31 2:35 PM
Reset Deadlines: Fitness 75247, Inc. answer due 6/30/2017; Fitness 77041, Inc. answer due 6/30/2017. (ml) |
||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Tue 05/30 3:19 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fitness 75247, Inc., Fitness 77041, Inc.. (Schultz, George) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 05/30 3:14 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Fitness 75247, Inc., Fitness 77041, Inc..(Schultz, George) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/11 2:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hyper Wear, Inc.. Fitness 75247, Inc. served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017. (Flores, Tecuan) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/11 1:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hyper Wear, Inc.. Fitness 77041, Inc. served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017. (Flores, Tecuan) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/05 8:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Fitness 75247, Inc., Fitness 77041, Inc., Fitness Depot, Inc.. (ml) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 05/04 8:27 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Hyper Wear, Inc.. Fitness Depot, Inc. [Canada] (Gray, Joseph) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 05/04 5:39 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Hyper Wear, Inc.. of Fitness 75247, Inc. d/b/a Dallas Fitness Depot and Fitness 77041, Inc. d/b/a/ Fitness Depot Houston (Gray, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120)
Tue 03/14 11:06 AM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with copy of Complaint. (afd) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Mon 03/13 5:20 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hyper Wear, Inc.. (Gray, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
26
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 5:16 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9387977). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Hyper Wear, Inc..(Gray, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - ISO Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - ISO Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - ISO Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - ISO Complaint, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E - ISO Complaint, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F - ISO Complaint | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/14 9:59 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 03/14 10:01 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hyper Wear, Inc.. (afd) |