Green Ocean Sciences, Inc. v. Blue Ocean Sciences, LLC et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Lee Yeakel |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00231 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 4:57 AM CDT |
Defendant
Blue Ocean Sciences, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Andrea Neal
|
|
Plaintiff
Green Ocean Sciences, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/07 1:31 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jf) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 11/07 1:30 PM
ORDER GRANTING6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jf) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Fri 11/03 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Dismissal by Green Ocean Sciences, Inc.(Johnson, Sean) Modified on 11/3/2017 (jf) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/04 3:30 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Green Ocean Sciences, Inc..(Collins, P.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D | ||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/03 12:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Green Ocean Sciences, Inc.. Blue Ocean Sciences, LLC served on 3/16/2017, answer due 4/6/2017. (Collins, P.) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 8:59 AM
Summons Issued as to Blue Ocean Sciences, LLC, and Andrea Neal. (gr) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 03/13 6:20 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by GREEN OCEAN SCIENCES INC. (Collins, P.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 6:18 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9388352), filed by GREEN OCEAN SCIENCES INC.(Collins, P.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/14 8:59 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (gr) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 03/14 9:02 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Green Ocean Sciences, Inc.. (gr) |