Walker v. Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Xavier Rodriguez |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00190 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 03, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 4:43 AM CDT |
Defendant
Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.
4851 Cox Rd.
Glen Allen, VA 23060 |
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Walker
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Terminated: 08/21/2017
Jeremiah Anderson 211 East 7th Street
Austin, TX 78701 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 35 minutes ago |
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 01/03 2:36 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej) |
|
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 01/03 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Capital One by Robert Walker(Howen, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
38 | 38
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 01/03 11:17 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Robert Walker. Show Cause Response due by 1/10/2018. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/27 4:03 PM
ORDER re36 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Robert Walker. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 11/22 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Robert Walker(Howen, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 10/31 3:11 PM
ORDER re34 Notice of Dismissal as to Trans Union LLC Only, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rg) |
|
34 | 34
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/30 11:05 AM
ORDER for Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 10/27 1:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Robert Walker, Trans Union LLC(Howen, Stephen) Modified on 10/27/2017, to add filer (rf) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 10/27 1:11 PM
NOTICE of Settlement for Experian by Robert Walker (Howen, Stephen) |
|
utility
Notice of Correction
Fri 10/27 3:35 PM
Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT "Trans Union LLC" HAS BEEN ADDED AS A FILER OF THIS DOCUMENT***re33 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (rf) |
||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Parties
Tue 08/22 11:55 AM
ORDER re30 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Robert Walker. Equifax Information Services LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/18 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Robert Walker(Michael, Devan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice
Mon 07/24 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC Only by Robert Walker (Michael, Devan) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice
Fri 07/07 6:27 PM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Robert Walker (Michael, Devan) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 07/06 10:44 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Status Conference held on 7/5/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Karl Myers.)(aej) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 06/22 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Monica Frugia Ramirez on behalf of Trans Union LLC. Attorney Monica Frugia Ramirez added to party Trans Union LLC(pty:dft) (Ramirez, Monica) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Status Conference (f)
Mon 06/05 1:45 PM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS FOR 7-5-17 at 10:00 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez.. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (jhw) |
|
24 | 24
order
Scheduling Order (f)
Mon 06/05 1:38 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 4 25-2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez; Jury Trial set for 5 7-2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez; ADR Report Deadline due by 1 26-2018 Discovery due by 1 19-2018 Dispositive Motions due by 2 2-2018 Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (jhw) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Fri 06/02 2:42 PM
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order and Rule 26(f) Joint Case Conference Report by Robert Walker.(Michael, Devan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 05/05 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Capital One Bank USA, N.A. by Robert Walker (Michael, Devan) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Advisory to the Court
Thu 05/04 6:02 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Robert Walker. (Michael, Devan) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 05/04 4:21 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Sendukas, Alexa) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 05/03 1:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Walker as to Defendant Trans Union LLC(Michael, Devan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
18 | 18
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 05/03 1:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Walker as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(Michael, Devan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
17 | 17
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 05/03 1:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Walker as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC(Michael, Devan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 05/02 2:50 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Trans Union LLC. (Myers, Paul) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order and Advisory (f)
Tue 05/02 1:56 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit agreed scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court. (Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due 6-2-17); Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (jhw) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Fri 04/21 2:41 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Trans Union LLC. (Myers, Paul) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/21 2:35 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint Defendant Trans Union LLC's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint . Attorney Paul L. Myers added to party Trans Union LLC(pty:dft) by Trans Union LLC.(Myers, Paul) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Fri 04/21 1:50 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Sendukas, Alexa) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/21 1:47 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint . Attorney Alexa Leigh Sendukas added to party Experian Information Solutions Inc(pty:dft) by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Sendukas, Alexa) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Fri 04/21 12:01 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Carter, Kendall) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/21 12:00 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Kendall W. Carter added to party Equifax Information Services LLC(pty:dft) by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Carter, Kendall) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/20 6:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert Walker as to Defendant Capital One Bank USA, N.A.(Michael, Devan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 11:01 AM
Summons Issued as to Trans Union LLC. (aej) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 10:59 AM
Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions Inc. (aej) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 10:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC. (aej) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 10:53 AM
Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.. (aej) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/16 11:35 AM
Text Order GRANTING3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lel) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/13 11:04 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Devan Elise Michael ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9385260) by on behalf of Robert Walker. (Howen, Stephen) Modified on 3/13/2017, to edit text (rf) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 03/13 10:56 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Robert Walker. (Howen, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 10:35 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9385031), filed by Robert Walker.(Howen, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/13 10:57 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rf) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Mon 03/13 10:58 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (rf) |