Neff et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | David A Ezra |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00191 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Jun 04, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 01, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 4:40 AM CDT |
Defendant
Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miriam Neff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ralph Neff
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 03/01 4:49 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (mgr) |
|
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/01 4:39 PM
ORDER CLOSING CASE AND ENTERING JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr) |
|
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
17
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Hearing
Thu 02/28 1:14 PM
ORDER GRANTING16 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING25 Motion for Hearing Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr) |
|
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Hearing
Wed 02/06 2:11 PM
***DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - PROPOSED ORDER REQUIRED*** MOTION for Hearing Request for Oral Hearing by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Cockcroft, Darrell) Modified on 2/6/2019, to designate deficiency (rf) |
|
utility
Notice of Correction
Wed 02/06 4:22 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - Proposed order required. DO NOT re-file entire document. Please file ONLY the proposed order using the (Attachment) event from menu and link the proposed order to the motion. See page 10, item 9d of the Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, Western District of Texas.****re25 MOTION for Hearing Request for Oral Hearing . (rf) |
||
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 01/30 12:28 PM
ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINE, ( Discovery due by 2/25/2019,). Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr) |
|
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Advisory to the Court
Thu 01/17 2:56 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Cockcroft, Darrell) |
|
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Pro Hac Vice Letter
Fri 11/09 11:54 AM
Pro Hac Vice Letter to Attorney Lauren Doughty as to Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (mgr) |
|
21 | 21
trial
Expert Witness List
Fri 11/09 11:44 AM
DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Cockcroft, Darrell) |
|
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 10/24 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darrell Sloan Cockcroft on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Cockcroft, Darrell) |
|
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
trial
Expert Witness List
Fri 09/28 3:25 PM
DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Miriam Neff, Ralph Neff.(Arguello, Andres) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 09/14 2:08 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company(Dennis, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Supplemental Appendix | ||
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 09/05 2:53 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Miriam Neff, Ralph Neff, re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company(Arguello, Andres) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order Denying Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment | ||
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 08/23 3:57 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Dennis, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B-1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B-2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B-3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B-4, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit B-5, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed order | ||
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
adr
ADR Report - Other
Tue 07/31 5:15 PM
ADR Report Filed - by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company(Dennis, Russell) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 07/06 9:03 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER, ( ADR Report Deadline due by 7/31/2018,, Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2018,, Discovery due by 1/25/2019,, Joinder of Parties due by 9/15/2018,, Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2019,)The Court will set the case for trial by separate order. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Wed 06/27 9:06 AM
Scheduling Recommendations by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Dennis, Russell) |
|
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
7
pgs
order
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial
Wed 06/06 11:26 AM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations. Parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 06/05 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell Lee Dennis on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Attorney Russell Lee Dennis added to party Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Dennis, Russell) |
|
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Tue 06/05 9:57 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (rf) |
||
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Reopen Case
Mon 06/04 3:20 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Reopen Case by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Dennis, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Mon 06/04 3:31 PM
Text Order GRANTING10 Unopposed Motion to Reopen Case. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to REOPEN this case. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ch) |
||
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Stay Case
Fri 07/14 11:21 AM
ORDER GRANTING8 Motion to Stay Case; The Parties are Ordered to update the Court with the status of the outcome of appraisal within fourteen (14) days of the completion of appraisal. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Stay Case
Mon 06/26 2:56 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case (Abate Proceedings) Pending Completion of Appraisal by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Higgins, Roger) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
adr
ADR Report - Other
Wed 06/07 10:46 AM
ADR Report Filed - JOINT by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company(Rosa, Vanessa) Modified on 6/7/2017, to add filers (mgr) |
|
utility
Notice of Correction
Wed 06/07 12:04 PM
Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT PLAINTIFFS WERE ADDED AS FILERS***re7 ADR Report - Other. (mgr) |
||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Tue 06/06 4:13 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Miriam Neff, Ralph Neff. (Arguello, Andres) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 04/24 2:34 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 11/11/2017 (aej) |
||
utility
Notice of Correction
Mon 04/24 2:35 PM
Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT ENTRY HAS BEEN EDITED TO REFLECT CORRECT MOTIONS DUE DATE***re5 Scheduling Order (aej) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 04/21 4:50 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 6/7/2017, Amended Pleadings due by 7/7/2017, Discovery due by 10/11/2017, Joinder of Parties due by 7/7/2017, Motions due by 1/11/2017. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
utility
Notice of Correction
Mon 04/17 7:56 AM
Notice of Correction: ****NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN EDITED TO REFLECT ALL PARTIES ARE FILERS OF THIS DOCUMENT*** re4 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. (rf) |
||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Fri 04/14 9:41 AM
Scheduling Recommendations filed by Allstate and by Ralph Neff. (Rosa, Vanessa) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial
Wed 03/15 7:49 AM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations. The Parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within 30 days from the date of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Mon 03/13 12:35 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Rosa, Vanessa) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/13 12:33 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-9385878), filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Rosa, Vanessa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Index of State Court Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet and Documents Filed in State Court, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/13 1:41 PM
Case Assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rf) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Mon 03/13 1:41 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Primomo (rf) |