James Mire v. Trumbull Insurance Company, et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Orlando L Garcia |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00193 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 4:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
James Madsen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trumbull Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Mire
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 08/02 12:23 PM
ORDER GRANTING10 Agreed Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss
Mon 07/31 10:27 AM
Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Trumbull Insurance Company.(Sadler, Martin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/06 2:39 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2018 9:30 AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia, Jury Selection and Trial set for 4/2/2018 9:30 AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia, ADR Report Deadline due by 9/4/2017, ADR Mediation Completed by 1/12/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 9/19/2017, Discovery due by 12/4/2017, Joinder of Parties due by 9/19/2017, Dispositive Motions due by 12/18/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Thu 06/01 12:27 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order Joint Scheduling Order by James Madsen, Trumbull Insurance Company. (Sadler, Martin) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 05/24 12:51 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by James Mire. (Blum, Kimberly) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Deficiency Notice
Tue 05/23 7:58 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: to attorney Kimberly Ninh Blum This Non-Consent needs to refiled because the box needs to be checked off. Please refile the consent form. re 5 Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge. (rg) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 05/17 12:19 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by James Mire. (Blum, Kimberly) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice
Wed 04/19 8:49 AM
NON-CONSENT of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by James Madsen, Trumbull Insurance Company (Sadler, Martin) Modified on 4/19/2017 (rg) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Tue 04/18 4:21 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY - the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. The parties are hereby ORDERED to notifythe Court whether or not they consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/04 3:13 PM
Original Answer and Defenses of Trumbull Insurance Company and James Madsen ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Trumbull Insurance Company.(Sadler, Martin) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/13 3:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trumbull Insurance Company and James Madsen (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-9386979), filed by Trumbull Insurance Company.(Sadler, Martin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit List of Parties and Counsel, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Index of Matters Being Filed, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Certified State Court File, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Supplement FJS44-SUPP | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/14 11:31 AM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Tue 03/14 11:31 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Primomo. (rg) |