Maura Pusateri v. Sea World of Texas LLC, et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Orlando L Garcia |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00194 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 4:22 AM CDT |
Defendant
Joel Slaven's Professional Animals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sea World of Texas LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maura Pusateri
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 10/31 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Maura Pusateri (Dean, Justin) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
trial
Expert Witness List
Tue 10/03 9:29 AM
DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Joel Slaven's Professional Animals, Inc., Sea World of Texas LLC.(Rangel, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B | ||
Sunday, September 03, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
trial
Expert Witness List
Sun 09/03 1:28 PM
DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Maura Pusateri. (Dean, Justin) |
|
11 | 11
trial
Expert Witness List
Sun 09/03 1:27 PM
DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Maura Pusateri. (Dean, Justin) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
adr
ADR Report - Other
Fri 08/04 2:06 PM
ADR Report Filed - by Joel Slaven's Professional Animals, Inc., Sea World of Texas LLC(Rangel, David) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Tue 08/01 12:04 PM
Text Order GRANTING9 Unopposed Motion to Substitute Attorney entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that David R. Rangel ofthe law offices of Davidson Troillo Ream & Garza, P.C., is hereby substituted as attorney of record for Defendant, SEA WORLD OF TEXAS LLC, in place of Jonathan H. Hull, and that all notices in this cause shall hereafter be served on the attorney of record, David R. Rangel.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) |
||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 07/28 3:06 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney Jonathan Hull by Sea World of Texas LLC.(Rangel, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order ORDER | ||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/06 2:50 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2017 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia, Jury Selection and Trial set for 3/5/2018 9:30AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia, ADR Report Deadline due by 8/4/2017, ADR Mediation Completed by 1/31/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 8/18/2017, Discovery due by 11/2/2017, Joinder of Parties due by 8/18/2017, Dispositive Motions due by 11/17/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 06/05 1:59 PM
Text Order GRANTING6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Justin M. Dean. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) |
||
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Fri 06/02 2:41 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Joel Slaven's Professional Animals, Inc.. (Rangel, David) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/01 11:02 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kyle Lynn Mathis Justin M. Dean ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9640513) by on behalf of Maura Pusateri. (Mathis, Kyle) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 05/15 12:36 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Joel Slaven's Professional Animals, Inc.. (Rangel, David) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Tue 04/18 3:28 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY - Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. The parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter/Correspondence
Tue 03/14 4:43 PM
Letter/Correspondence to attorney Justin M. Dean regarding Admission to Practice in the Western District of Texas. (rg) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/13 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Joel Slaven's Professional Animals, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-9387648), filed by Joel Slaven's Professional Animals, Inc..(Rangel, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Attachments | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice
Mon 03/13 4:26 PM
NOTICE Consent to Removal by Sea World of Texas LLC (Hull, Jonathan) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/14 3:00 PM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Tue 03/14 3:01 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Primomo. (rg) |