Robert Cantu v. United Receivables Group, LLC
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Xavier Rodriguez |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00197 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 5:17 AM CDT |
Defendant
United Receivables Group, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert Cantu
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Firstsource Advantage, LLC
Terminated: 05/15/2017
|
Docket last updated: 17 minutes ago |
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/17 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Robert Cantu (Bennecoff Ginsburg, Amy) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Wed 07/12 3:33 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to United Receivables Group, LLC (wg) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Entry of Default
Thu 07/06 3:09 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default Request against United Receivables Group by Robert Cantu.(Bennecoff Ginsburg, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Wed 07/05 4:08 PM
ORDER the Court ORDERS that Plaintiff move for entry of default and default judgment by no later than August 7, 2017. Failure to respond by that date will result in dismissal of Plaintiffs claims against Defendant. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 06/06 8:08 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Cantu. United Receivables Group, LLC served on 6/5/2017, answer due 6/26/2017. (Bennecoff Ginsburg, Amy) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/16 8:02 AM
Summons Issued as to United Receivables Group, LLC. (wg) |
|
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 05/15 1:53 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against United Receivables Group, LLC amending1 Complaint., filed by Robert Cantu.(wg) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 05/15 9:41 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Robert Cantu. (Bennecoff Ginsburg, Amy) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Amend Complaint
Mon 05/15 9:07 AM
Text Order GRANTING5 Motion to Amend Complaint entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for Plaintiff to serve Defendant United Receivables Group, LLC is August 14, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pp) |
||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Amend Complaint
Fri 05/12 6:09 PM
MOTION to Amend Complaint by Robert Cantu.(Bennecoff Ginsburg, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 03/27 8:20 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Cantu as to Firstsource Advantage, LLC. Waiver sent on 3/24/2017, answer due 5/23/2017. (Bennecoff Ginsburg, Amy) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 3:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Firstsource Advantage, LLC. (wg) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 03/13 4:50 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Robert Cantu. (Bennecoff Ginsburg, Amy) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 4:49 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9387994), filed by Robert Cantu.(Bennecoff Ginsburg, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/14 10:33 AM
Case Randomly Assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Tue 03/14 10:34 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg) |