Starfall Education Foundation v. Trion Worlds, Inc.
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Kristen L Mix |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00650 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 4:15 AM MDT |
Defendant
Trion Worlds, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Starfall Education Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
utility
Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC
Thu 06/01 8:20 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 5/30/2017. Text Only Entry (jgonz, ) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case
Tue 05/30 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Starfall Education Foundation (Allison, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Minute Order
Wed 04/26 3:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER re:9 Notice of Settlement filed by Starfall Education Foundation. Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2017, at10:00 a.m. is VACATED, Dismissal Paper due by 5/31/2017, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/26/2017. (jgonz, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 04/25 12:27 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Starfall Education Foundation (Allison, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Thu 03/30 9:15 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Starfall Education Foundation. Trion Worlds, Inc. served on 3/15/2017, answer due 4/5/2017. (Allison, Benjamin) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/14 3:52 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Allison, Benjamin) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Tue 03/14 8:29 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/13/17. Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (lgale, ) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment 2 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Advisory Attorney Noncompliance
Mon 03/13 2:42 PM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re:1 Complaint, filed by attorney JOHN PURVIS. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (sphil, ) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Report re: Patent/Trademark
Mon 03/13 2:33 PM
Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (sphil, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Summons Issued
Mon 03/13 2:31 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (sphil, ) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Mon 03/13 2:26 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (sphil, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/13 11:24 AM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Trion Worlds, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5420850)Attorney John A. Purvis added to party Starfall Education Foundation(pty:pla), filed by Starfall Education Foundation.(Purvis, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Summons |