(PS) Willow Court Apartments LLC v. Perkins et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Mendez |
Referred: | Allison Claire |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00523 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 2:35 AM PDT |
Defendant
Brenda Perkins
8303 Walerga Rd. #84
Antelope, CA 95843 |
|
Defendant
Justin Perkins
8303 Walerga Rd., #84
Antelope, CA 95843 |
|
Plaintiff
Willow Court Apartments LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Case Remanded ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 1:44 PM
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/13/17 REMANDING this case to the Superior Court for the County of Sacramento for all future proceedings; the defendant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot. CASE CLOSED. (Becknal, R) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 03/14 1:45 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Order served on Brenda Perkins, Justin Perkins and Sacramento Superior . (Becknal, R) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/13 11:53 AM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Brenda Perkins. (Zignago, K.) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/13 11:52 AM
CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties by Brenda Perkins. (Zignago, K.) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/13 11:50 AM
NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, Case number 17UD00347 filed by Brenda Perkins. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |