Jimenez v. Medline Industries, Inc., et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kimberly J Mueller |
Referred: | Deborah Barnes |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00536 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 2:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
Medline Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marcus Rodriguez
|
|
Plaintiff
Antonio Jimenez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Costs Taxed
Tue 11/13 8:30 AM
COSTS TAXED in amount of $ 1089.65 against Antonio Jimenez. (Coll, A) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Bill of Costs Submitted
Tue 08/28 9:09 AM
BILL of COSTS SUBMITTED by Medline Industries, Inc..(Adams, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service by Mail | ||
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Judgment
Thu 08/16 2:37 PM
JUDGMENT dated *8/16/2018* pursuant to order, signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/15/2018. |
|
21 | 21
16
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 08/16 2:33 PM
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/15/2018 GRANTING14 Medline Industries, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation
Tue 07/31 12:50 PM
STIPULATION to Modify Second Amended Scheduling Order by Antonio Jimenez. (Wimert, Ethan) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/30 2:46 PM
STIPULATION to Modify Second Amended Scheduling Order by Antonio Jimenez. (Wimert, Ethan) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Fri 07/13 1:30 PM
MINUTES for MOTION HEARING held before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/13/2018. Attorney, Ethan Wimert, present for Plaintiff. Attorney, Steven Groode, present for Defendant Medline Industries, Inc. After hearing oral argument, the court took Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No.14 ) under submission. A court ruling will issue. Court Reporter: Kelly O'Halloran. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 07/06 2:16 PM
REPLY by Medline Industries, Inc. to RESPONSE to14 Motion for Summary Judgment or Alternatively Partial Summary Judgment.(Adams, John) |
|
Att: 1 Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Disputed & Undisputed Facts, | ||
Att: 2 Notice Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 3 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Opposition to Motion
Fri 06/29 3:58 PM
OPPOSITION by Antonio Jimenez to14 Motion for Summary Judgment or Alternatively Partial Summary Judgment.(Wimert, Ethan) |
|
Att: 1 Response to Defendant's Separate Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Marjorie J. Heinrich, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 06/15 3:10 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Medline Industries, Inc. re14 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Adams, John) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 06/15 2:18 PM
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT or Alternatively Partial Summary Judgment by Medline Industries, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller.(Adams, John) Modified on 6/15/2018 |
|
Att: 1 Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of John H. Adams, Jr., | ||
Att: 4 Declaration Scott Saling, | ||
Att: 5 Appendix of Exhibits | ||
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 05/17 2:00 PM
MINUTES (Text Only) by CRD for SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE proceedings before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/17/2018. CASE NOT SETTLED. Plaintiffs Counsel Marjorie Heinrich present. Defendants Counsel Steven Groode present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO. (Anderson, J) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 03/20 1:56 PM
SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/19/2018 ORDERING Expert Disclosures RESET to 7/31/2018; Supplemental Expert Disclosures RESET to 8/21/2018; Completion of Expert Discovery RESET to 9/25/2018. This amendment does not alter any other portions of the initial scheduling order (ECF No.8 ), or the first amendment to the scheduling order (ECF No.10 )(Becknal, R) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Thu 03/08 3:58 PM
STIPULATION to Modify First Amended Scheduling Order by Antonio Jimenez. (Wimert, Ethan) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 10/20 11:11 AM
FIRST AMENDMENT TO THE SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/19/2017 ORDERING Expert Disclosures RESET to 3/12/2018; the Settlement Conference RESET for 5/17/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows; Discovery cutoff RESET to 5/1/2018; Hearing on Dispositive Motions RESET to 7/13/2018; VACATING the final four dates to be reset as needed after ruling on potential dispositive motions. This amendment does not alter any other portions of the initial scheduling order (ECF No.8 ). (Becknal, R) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Thu 10/12 10:37 AM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Modify Pretrial Scheduling Order by Medline Industries, Inc.. (Adams, John) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 08/17 10:45 AM
STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/16/2017 ORDERING: Discovery due by 12/29/2017; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/9/2017; A supplemental list of expert witnesses due by 11/30/2017; All expert discovery shall be completed by 12/29/2017; All dispositive motions, except motions for continuances, TROs or other emergency applications, shall be heard no later than 1/26/2018; Settlement Conference set for 11/16/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows; A joint pretrial conference statement due by 3/30/2018; Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Trial briefs are due by 5/28/2018; and a Jury Trial set for 6/11/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Washington, S) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Thu 08/03 11:57 AM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE held on 8/3/2017. Plaintiff's Counsel, Ethan Wimer, present. Defendant Medline's Counsel, John Adams, present. The court and counsel discussed case scheduling. Plaintiff requested 90 days for service of defendant Rodriguez. Counsel discussed scheduling a settlement conference in November. A formal written scheduling order will issue. Court Reporter: Diane Shepard. (Waldrop, A) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 07/14 10:07 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: In light of a scheduling conflict and on the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 7/20/2017 is VACATED and RESET for 8/3/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Status Report
Thu 07/13 12:21 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Medline Industries, Inc.. (Adams, John) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Statement
Tue 03/21 10:12 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Medline Industries, Inc. (Adams, John) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 03/14 1:41 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Medline Industries, Inc.. (Adams, John) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil New Case Documents for KJM
Mon 03/13 4:03 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kaminski, H) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/13 3:23 PM
NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UPI-2016-2986 by Medline Industries, Inc..(Adams, John) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Marcus Rodriguez, | ||
Att: 3 Proof of Service | ||
misc
CAED Receipt
Mon 03/13 3:41 PM
RECEIPT number #CAE200080695 $400.00 fbo Medline Industries, Inc. by National Legal, LLC on 3/13/2017. (Kaminski, H) |