Kalmbach v. National Rifle Association of America et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ricardo S Martinez |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00399 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 2:33 AM PDT |
Defendant
InfoCision, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Rifle Association of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katharyn Kalmbach
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 07/16 8:51 AM
***Civil Case Terminated per52 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. (PM) |
||
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
52 | 52
misc
Stipulation
Fri 07/13 12:02 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by parties (Peluso, Patrick) |