Keith Roberts v. Nancy Berryhill
Original Case: 1:15-cv-01232
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01533 |
Type | civil / us / social security |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 23, 2018 2:37 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
KEITH A. ROBERTS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/23/2018 2:31 AM CST |
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 U.S. civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 03/27/2017. [1] [6825296] 17-1533 (MM) | |
2 | 2 Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Keith A. Roberts leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 03/13/2017. [2] [6825330] 17-1533 (CAG) |