Emma Cehovic-Dixneuf v. Lisa Wong
Original Case: 1:15-cv-08785
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01532 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2018 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 12, 2018 3:35 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
LISA WONG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
EMMA CEHOVIC-DIXNEUF
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/12/2018 3:33 AM CDT |
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 03/27/2017. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Lisa Wong by 03/17/2017. Appellant's brief due on or before 04/24/2017 for Lisa Wong. [1] [6825306] 17-1532 (AD) |