Natasha Adams v. City of Peoria, Illinois, et al
Original Case: 1:14-cv-01415
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01535 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 14, 2018 3:33 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF PEORIA, ILLINOIS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PEORIA POLICE DEPARTMENT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
TODD GREEN, Lieutenant
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MATT LEGASPI, Officer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID COX
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
NATASHA ADAMS
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 13 2018
Filed Nonprecedential Disposition PER CURIAM. AFFIRMED. Diane P. Wood, Chief Judge; Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge and Amy C. Barrett, Circuit Judge. [6910185-1] [6910185] [17-1535] |
Docket last updated: 03/14/2018 3:27 AM CDT |
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Natasha Adams by 03/20/2017. Transcript information sheet due by 03/27/2017. [1] [6825299] 17-1535 (AP) |