Daniel Brown v. Presstime Graphics, Inc., et al
Original Case: 2:13-cv-00425
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01530 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 09, 2017 3:36 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
PRESSTIME GRAPHICS, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
JOSEPH H. SELLIKEN, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
OSLER INSTITUTION, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
OSLER INSTITUTE, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
DANIEL L. BROWN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2017 3:31 AM CDT |
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 03/27/2017. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Osler Institution, Incorporated, Presstime Graphics, Incorporated and Joseph H. Selliken Jr. by 03/17/2017. Appellant's brief due on or before 04/24/2017 for Osler Institution, Incorporated, Presstime Graphics, Incorporated and Joseph H. Selliken Jr. [1] [6825381] 17-1530 (FP) |