Colleen Auer v. City of Minot
Original Case: 4:15-cv-00040
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01535 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 20, 2018 3:29 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
City of Minot
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Colleen M. Auer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/20/2018 3:29 AM CDT |
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
Civil case docketed. [4511446] 17-1535 (CYZ) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order of 2/8/2017, judgment of 2/8/2017 [4511451] 17-1535 (CYZ) | ||
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 04/24/2017. Appendix due 05/02/2017. BRIEF APPELLANT, Colleen M. Auer due 05/02/2017 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4511455] 17-1535 (CYZ) |
||
APPEARANCE filed by Randall J. Bakke for Appellee City of Minot w/service 03/13/2017 [4511565] 17-1535 (RJB) |