Arsenal Investments, LLC
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-01606 |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Arsenal Investments, LLC
8250 Allison Point #220
Indianapolis, IN 46250 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Service - Notice of Dismissal
Thu 04/20 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - NOTICE OF DISMISSAL . No. of Notices: 3 Notice Date 04/19/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 04/18 3:18 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (lak) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Dismiss Case
Mon 04/17 3:02 PM
Order Dismissing Case. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order . (hhd) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Initial Documents
Thu 03/23 10:43 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Statement of Affairs and Small Business Financials and Income and Expense Schedule for Non Individual Debtor . Attorney for the debtor must distribute this order. Incomplete Filings due by 4/13/2017. (hhd) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extend Time to File Initial Documents (Schedules, Plan, Pay Advices, Etc.), Motion to
Wed 03/22 4:58 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Statement of Affairs and Small Business Financials and Income and Expense Schedule for Non Individual Debtor filed by Christopher J McElwee on behalf of Debtor Arsenal Investments, LLC. (McElwee, Christopher) |
|
Sunday, March 19, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Service - 341 Meeting Notice
Mon 03/20 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - 341 MEETING NOTICE . No. of Notices: 6 Notice Date 03/19/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Service - Notice
Sat 03/18 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - NOTICE . No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 03/17/2017. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Service - Notice
Sat 03/18 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - NOTICE . No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 03/17/2017. (Admin.) |
|
9 | 9
court
341 Meeting Notice - Ch 11
Fri 03/17 9:28 AM
Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 4/19/2017 at 10:00 AM EDT in Rm 416A U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. Objections to Dischargeability due by 6/19/2017. (lad) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 03/15 5:12 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 1007(a)(1) filed by Christopher J McElwee on behalf of Debtor Arsenal Investments, LLC. (McElwee, Christopher) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Disclosure of Compensation
Wed 03/15 5:11 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor filed by Christopher J McElwee on behalf of Debtor Arsenal Investments, LLC. (McElwee, Christopher) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Amended/Corrected Petition
Wed 03/15 5:09 PM
Corrected Voluntary Petition to reflect petition, attorney disclosure of compensation and corporate ownership statement, filed by Christopher J McElwee on behalf of Debtor Arsenal Investments, LLC . (McElwee, Christopher) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Wed 03/15 4:53 PM
Appearance filed by Jeannette Eisan Hinshaw on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Hinshaw, Jeannette) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Appearance
Wed 03/15 4:28 PM
Appearance filed by Jeannette Eisan Hinshaw on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Hinshaw, Jeannette) |
|
3 | 3
court
Deficiency Notice - Petition
Wed 03/15 9:06 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued . List of Equity Security Holders due by 03/28/2017. Verification of Creditor List due by 03/28/2017. (lak) |
|
2 | 2
court
7-Day Notice of Incomplete Filing
Wed 03/15 1:00 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filing issued to Christopher McElwee. Failure to file required item(s) by the due date may result in the striking of the incomplete filing, the dismissal of the Bankruptcy case without further notice, or other action as the Court deems appropriate. Required item(s): A $1717.00 filing fee is due for the Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition filed on 03/14/2017 . Incomplete Filing due by 03/22/2017. (Admin) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 03/15 1:22 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 17-01606 11) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 26989384. Fee amount 1717.00 . Deadline terminated: Notice of Incomplete Filing (2). (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
7
pgs
misc
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
Tue 03/14 5:32 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Non-Individual) with Corporate Ownership Statement, List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of Equity Security Holders, List of Secured Creditors and Verification of Creditor List filed by Christopher J McElwee on behalf of Arsenal Investments, LLC. Income & Expense Schedule due by 03/28/2017. Small Business Balance Sheet due by 03/21/2017. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due by 03/21/2017. Small Business Statement of Operations due by 03/21/2017. Small Business Tax Return due by 03/21/2017. Attorney Disclosure of Compensation due by 03/28/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs with Declaration due by 03/28/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities with Declaration due by 03/28/2017. Schedule A/B with Declaration due by 03/28/2017. Schedule D with Declaration due by 03/28/2017. Schedule E/F with Declaration due by 03/28/2017. Schedule G with Declaration due by 03/28/2017. Schedule H with Declaration due by 03/28/2017. (McElwee, Christopher) |
|
court
Judge - Terminate/Add
Tue 03/14 5:38 PM
Judge Jeffrey J. Graham assigned. (kpd) |