UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MARTINEZ
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Marc Thomas Treadwell |
Case #: | 5:17-mc-00002 |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 10/02 1:42 PM
ORDER GRANTING3 Motion to Close Miscellaneous Case. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 10/2/2017. (tlh) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 10/02 10:40 AM
MOTION to Close Miscellaneous Case by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by DANIAL EDWARD BENNETT.(BENNETT, DANIAL) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc)
Thu 03/16 8:56 AM
ORDER GRANTING1 Motion for Extension of Time. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 3/16/2017. (tlh) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Extension of Time (Misc)
Tue 03/14 4:02 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Timne to Commence Judicial Action by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by DANIAL EDWARD BENNETT.(ggs) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order |