Garner v. Lynch et al
Georgia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William T Moore, Jr |
Referred: | Christopher L Ray |
Case #: | 4:17-mc-00004 |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 01/11 10:47 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray. Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (jrb) |
||
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
notice (Other)
Fri 08/11 10:28 AM
NOTICE Dismissing re2 Complaint. (jrb) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/16 2:45 PM
COMPLAINT and Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis received from Valencia Garner. NOT FILED PER R&R IN CASE 4:17CV25.(jrb) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 06/16 2:45 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 7/16/2017. (jrb) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 10:51 AM
COMPLAINT received from Valencia Garner.(trb) (trb). NOT FILED PER R&R IN CASE 4:17CV25 (trb). Modified on 3/14/2017 (trb) |
|
Att: 1 Part II, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Att: 3 (3/14/2017) Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 03/14 12:06 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 4/12/2017. (trb) |