DeSota v. LSC Communications
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Theresa L Springmann |
Referred: | Susan L Collins |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00094 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age) |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 4:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
LSC Communications US LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carla DeSota
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
LSC Communications
Terminated: 06/08/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 08/18 10:14 AM
CASE DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure pursuant to the22 Joint Motion to Dismiss. (jlb) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss
Mon 08/07 7:07 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Plaintiff Carla DeSota. (Smith, Ilene) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 07/12 4:46 PM
NOTICE by LSC Communications US LLC of Selection of Mediator (Hall, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs
Thu 06/15 3:45 PM
TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 6/14/2017 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Skyler Spurling-Newsome. Dft appeared by attys Caralyn Olie and Elizabeth Hall. The15 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 2/22/2018. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Parties to file their selection of a mediator by 7/12/2017. Magistrate Consent forms due by 7/5/2017. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 06/12 4:40 PM
ANSWER to17 Amended Complaint by LSC Communications US LLC.(Hall, Elizabeth) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/09 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Skyler B Spurling-Newsome on behalf of Carla DeSota (Spurling-Newsome, Skyler) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 06/08 9:48 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against LSC Communications US LLC filed by Carla DeSota.(cer) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 06/08 9:39 AM
ORDER GRANTING14 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint by Plaintiff Carla DeSota. Clerk DIRECTED to show Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (DE14 -1 ) filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 6/8/17. (cer) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Wed 06/07 4:19 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hall, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 05/24 10:15 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Carla DeSota.(Smith, Ilene) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 05/24 4:00 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: per de8 LSC Communications answer due by June 12, 2017. (mc) |
||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/18 12:21 PM
ORDER granting11 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Caralyn M Olie PHV for LSC Communications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 5/18/17. (mtr) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/18 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth N Hall on behalf of LSC Communications (Hall, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/17 2:46 PM
Application for Attorney Caralyn Marie Olie to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of LSC Communications US, LLC f/k/a R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3252691(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated
Thu 05/11 3:07 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. (mr) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Hearing/Deadlines
Thu 05/11 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2017 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer
Thu 05/11 2:12 PM
AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by LSC Communications ; answer due by June 12, 2017. (Wilson, Heather) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 05/11 2:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by LSC Communications identifying Corporate Parent LSC Communications Inc for LSC Communications.. (Wilson, Heather) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/11 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Heather L Wilson on behalf of LSC Communications (Wilson, Heather) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 05/01 10:23 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann for all further proceedings. Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen no longer assigned to case. The period for consent to a magistrate judges jurisdiction is reopened through 5/22/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/17. (nal) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/25 5:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carla DeSota. LSC Communications served on 4/24/2017, answer due 5/15/2017. (Smith, Ilene) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/15 9:34 AM
Summons Issued as to LSC Communications. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jss) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/14 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C Myers on behalf of Carla DeSota (Myers, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 4:53 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3194701.), filed by Carla DeSota.(Smith, Ilene) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A (COD), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B (NORTS), | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 03/15 9:34 AM
Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. *NEW CASE* (jss) |