Tucker v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sue E Myerscough |
Referred: | Tom Schanzle-Haskins |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-03073 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 4:00 AM CDT |
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Tucker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 04/26 10:38 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties have filed a Stipulation for Dismissal17 . Pursuant to the Stipulation, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear his or its own costs. The pending Motion to Enforce Settlement16 is DENIED AS MOOT. No judgment to enter. CASE CLOSED. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 4/26/2018. (MAS, ilcd) |
||
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 04/24 3:44 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (DeFranco, James) |
|
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 04/20 3:53 PM
MOTION Enforce Settlement by Plaintiff Gerald Tucker. Responses due by 5/4/2018(Darr, Lanny) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C | ||
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 04/03 12:41 PM
TEXT ORDER: The parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time15 is GRANTED. The parties' deadline to file a stipulation to dismiss is extended to May 2, 2018. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 4/3/2018. (MJC, ilcd) |
||
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 04/02 3:13 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Responses due by 4/16/2018 (DeFranco, James) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
minutes
Mediation 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 03/01 1:12 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Present in person is Plaintiff Gerald Tucker and counsel, Lanny Darr and Chris Tucker. Present in person for Defendant is Andrew Zumwalt and counsel, James DeFranco. Mediation conducted among the parties. Mediation successful. Parties agree to terms of settlement and execute final settlement agreement. Parties to file a stipulation to dismiss with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs, pursuant to final settlement agreement within 30 days. All pending deadlines are vacated. Final pretrial and jury trial settings remain as scheduled. (LB, ilcd) |
||
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 02/20 11:31 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Telephonic status conference held with counsel for Plaintiff, Lanny H. Darr, and counsel for Defendant, James DeFranco. Discussion held regarding setting this case for mediation. By joint request the Court schedules mediation on Thursday, March 1, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. CST in Courtroom 3 in Springfield before Judge Schanzle-Haskins. Confidential mediation statements pursuant to Judge Schanzle-Haskins' Mediation Memorandum to be submitted to Judge Schanzle-Haskins via fax to (217) 492-4596 or e-mail to lesa_blagburn@ilcd.uscourts.gov on or before close of business on February 26, 2018. Mediation statements are not to be e-filed. (LB, ilcd) |
||
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/06 3:36 PM
NOTICE Plaintiff's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Darr, Lanny) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion
Tue 01/30 1:43 PM
TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiff's Motion to Inspect and Photograph13 (Motion) is ALLOWED. Plaintiff filed the Motion and served defense counsel electronically through the Court's CM/ECF system on January 11, 2018. A non-moving party must respond to a motion within 14 days of service or the Court presumes that the non-moving party has no objection to the motion. Local Rule 7.1(B)(2). More than 14 days have passed since service and Defendant has not responded to the Motion. Defendant is presumed to have no objection to the Motion. Defendant is ordered to produce the wheeled customer use cart and employee merchandise conveyance cart involved in the incident alleged in the Complaint1 on a date and place certain on or before March 2, 2018, to allow the Plaintiff or his representatives to photograph, weigh, measure, and inspect the two carts. (LB, ilcd) |
||
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
motion
Order
Thu 01/11 11:06 AM
MOTION for Order by Plaintiff Gerald Tucker. Responses due by 1/25/2018 (Darr, Lanny) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 07/17 11:33 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gerald Tucker (Darr, Lanny) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate
Thu 06/29 9:40 AM
CERTIFICATE of Compliance . (DeFranco, James) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance of Attorney
Wed 06/21 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Brittany P Warren on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc (Warren, Brittany) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
Tue 06/20 4:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. TIME LIMITS AND SETTINGS ARE ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Initial Disclosures due by 6/30/2017; Joinder of Parties due by 7/28/2017; Amended Pleadings due by 7/28/2017; Plaintiff`s Expert Disclosure due by 10/16/2017; Defendant`s Expert Disclosure due by 12/15/2017; All Discovery due by 2/19/2018; Dispositive Motions due by 3/2/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set 7/2/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 1 in Springfield before U.S. District Judge Sue E. Myerscough. Jury Trial set 7/17/2018 at 9:00 AM before Judge Myerscough. Telephonic Status Conference set Tuesday, 2/20/2018, at 10:30 AM (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Schanzle-Haskins. See written order. (LB, ilcd) |
|
8 | 8
minutes
Scheduling Conference - Rule 16
Tue 06/20 10:19 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 6/20/2017 with Attorneys Lanny Darr and James DeFranco. Written Scheduling Order to follow. Parties are reminded of their option to consent to proceed before U.S. Magistrate Judge. See attached forms. (LB, ilcd) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Wed 06/14 11:26 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (DeFranco, James) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 05/15 10:39 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set Tuesday, 6/20/2017, at 10:00 AM (court will place call) before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Attorneys are directed to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by meeting as soon as practicable, and in any event at least fourteen (14) days prior to the scheduling conference, and are to submit a proposed discovery plan in writing to the Court on or before 6/16/2017. Such a plan must include, at a minimum, those items listed in CDIL-LR 26.2(3), Rule 16(b), Rule 26(f), and CDIL-LR 16.2(E) with proposed deadlines. The parties are directed to specifically address the provisions, if any, for discovery or disclosure of electronically stored information, and to discuss agreements, if any, the parties reach for asserting claims of privilege or of protection as trial preparation material, after inadvertent production. Any plan filed shall specifically address the need, or lack thereof, concerning discovery of electronically stored information. If a discovery plan is not submitted as required, the scheduling hearing will not be held and costs may be assessed. Lead counsel or other counsel of record with knowledge of the case should be available to participate in the Rule 16 scheduling hearing. (LB, ilcd) |
||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Interest
Fri 04/28 3:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (DeFranco, James) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance of Attorney
Fri 04/28 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James E DeFranco on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc (DeFranco, James) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/28 3:49 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.(DeFranco, James) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 04/19 11:08 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Jeremy Rigsby on 03/31/2017, filed by Gerald Tucker. (Darr, Lanny) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/29 9:34 AM
Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and forwarded to the Plaintiff's attorney for effectuation of service. (MAS, ilcd) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Attorney Complaint
Tue 03/14 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2528774.), filed by Gerald Tucker.(Darr, Lanny) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Summons |