Carroll v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02108 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 10, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 4:16 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Unidentified Parties
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Mary L Carroll
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, July 10, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 07/10 4:09 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice- originally filed as rec. doc. 17741 in master case 14-md-2592. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/30/2020.(dw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Tue 02/06 2:13 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re6 Summons Submitted for Issuance. **Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of counsel of record. Clerk issued summons after editing the information regarding plaintiff's counsel. A motion to enroll as co-counsel or to substitute counsel, along with a proposed order, must be filed into the master case. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP.** (jls) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 02/06 2:04 PM
Summons Issued as to Janssen Ortho LLC. (jls) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Submitted for Issuance
Fri 02/02 2:49 PM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Overholtz, Neil) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/01 9:24 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare AG, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson.(ss) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons | ||
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Submitted for Issuance
Wed 01/31 2:17 PM
Summons Submitted for Issuance(Overholtz, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 03/21 10:51 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 03/14 1:54 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (jeg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 11:08 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6022883) filed by Mary L Carroll.Attorney Ryan M. Anderson added to party Mary L Carroll(pty:pla).(Anderson, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |