Bayou Black Electric Supply, L.L.C. et al v. William Kallop D/B et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Susie Morgan |
Referred: | Janis Van Meerveld |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02109 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333 Admiralty |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 4:17 AM CDT |
Defendant
Offshore Specialty Fabricators, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WILLIAM KALLOP D/B
|
|
Intervenor Defendant
Offshore Specialty Fabricators, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
William Kallop D/B
|
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
MARMAC, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bayou Black Electric Supply, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Delta Rigging & Tools, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Morgan City Rentals
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Spartan Industrial Products
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 11/17 11:37 AM
ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 11/16/2017.(clc) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order Transferring Case
Wed 07/05 4:18 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Status Conference held on 7/5/2017. The Court informed the parties that all claims in the consolidated case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge van Meerveld. Case transferred to Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/5/2017. (NEF: MAG 1, MAG 2)(clc) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Fri 06/30 4:35 PM
ORDER: ORDERED that Member Case 17-2109 is consolidated with Master Case 17-1595 Pursuant to the Court's directive, all pleadings hereafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the lead consolidated case, together with the docket number of all cases within the consolidation, and a specific notation as to which case the document applies or the notation "ALL CASES" if it applies to all cases. All entries shall be made on the master docket sheet only, with a notation listing the cases to which the document applies. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/30/2017.(clc) |
|
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian
Fri 06/30 2:12 PM
ORDER granting27 Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/30/2017. (3cc: USM) (clc) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Appoint/Substitute Custodian
Thu 06/29 5:59 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint/Substitute Custodian by WILLIAM KALLOP D/B.Attorney Robert Joshua Koch, Jr added to party WILLIAM KALLOP D/B(pty:dft).(Koch, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 06/30 11:15 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Status Conference held on 6/27/2017. A telephone status conference will be held on Wednesday, July 5, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. The Court will provide the parties with call-in instructions at a later date. (clc) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order Set Hearings
Thu 06/22 4:07 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a status conference be held in chambers on Tuesday, June 27, 2017 at 3:30 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel in other cases involving these vessels, D/B WILLIAM KALLOP and the D/B SWING THOMPSON, are invited to attend. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
answer
Answer to Intervenor Complaint
Wed 05/31 4:06 PM
ANSWER to17 Intervenor Complaint by Offshore Specialty Fabricators, LLC.Attorney Caitlin P. Morgenstern added to party Offshore Specialty Fabricators, LLC(pty:intvd).(Morgenstern, Caitlin) |
|
24 | 24
answer
Answer to Intervenor Complaint
Wed 05/31 3:57 PM
ANSWER to17 Intervenor Complaint by William Kallop D/B.Attorney Caitlin P. Morgenstern added to party William Kallop D/B(pty:intvd).(Morgenstern, Caitlin) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
discov
Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint)
Thu 05/25 1:44 PM
Return of Service of Vessel Seizure served on D/B William Kallop on 5/17/2017(clc) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Warrant Issued
Fri 05/12 4:53 PM
WARRANT of Arrest of vessel issued. (3cc: USM)(clc) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem
Fri 05/12 4:36 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/12/2017. (3cc: USM)(clc) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Thu 05/11 5:28 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re19 Order.**Please disregard previously filed Order, filed in an incorrect case number by Clerk.** (clc) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order
Thu 05/11 5:16 PM
**FILED IN ERROR- WRONG CASE** ORDERED that the16 Court's Order granting Encore Food Services, LLCs14 Motion for Leave to intervene is VACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that Encore Food Services, LLCs14 Motion for Leave to Intervene is set for submission on May 31, 2017. FURTHER ORDERED that Encore Food Services, LLCs17 Intervening Complaint is VACATED. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/11/2017.(clc) Modified on 5/11/2017 (clc) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in rem
Thu 05/11 10:15 AM
MOTION for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in rem by MARMAC, LLC.(Mouledoux, Andre) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Intervenor Complaint
Wed 05/10 12:56 PM
Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by MARMAC, LLC.(clc) |
|
Att: 1 Verification, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 05/10 12:23 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Leave to File Verified Complaint. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/10/2017. (clc) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 05/03 11:37 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re14 MOTION for Leave to File Verified Complaint of Intervention .** Exh B image filed upside down. Image corrected and replaced by Clerk.** (clc) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Leave to File Document
Tue 05/02 1:58 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Verified Complaint of Intervention by MARMAC, LLC.Attorney Andre J. Mouledoux added to party MARMAC, LLC(pty:intv).(Mouledoux, Andre) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Verified Complaint in Intervention, | ||
Att: 3 Verification of Patrick M. Stant, Prresident of MARMAC, LLC, | ||
Att: 4 Local Rule 7.6E Certificate, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit "A", | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit "B" | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/02 1:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, by WILLIAM KALLOP D/B.Attorney Caitlin P. Morgenstern added to party WILLIAM KALLOP D/B(pty:dft).(Morgenstern, Caitlin) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/02 1:01 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, by Offshore Specialty Fabricators, LLC.(Morgenstern, Caitlin) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respoth
Claim
Tue 04/18 2:49 PM
CLAIM of Owner by Offshore Specialty Fabricators, LLC. Attorney Robert Joshua Koch, Jr added to party Offshore Specialty Fabricators, LLC(pty:dft).(Koch, Robert) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Warrant Returned
Tue 03/21 1:51 PM
WARRANT Returned Executed as to William Kallop D/B on 3/15/2017. (cg) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 03/21 11:22 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Offshore Specialty Fabricators, LLC served on 3/15/2017, answer due 4/5/2017. (cg) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 2:08 PM
Summons Issued as to Offshore Specialty Fabricators, LLC. (cg) |
|
7 | 7
order
Warrant Issued
Tue 03/14 1:09 PM
WARRANT of arrest of vessel issued. (cg)(3ccUSM) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian
Tue 03/14 1:00 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/14/2017. (cg)(3ccUSM) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem
Tue 03/14 12:59 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/14/2017. (cg)(3ccUSM) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 03/14 11:29 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (jeg) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in rem
Tue 03/14 11:18 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in rem by Bayou Black Electric Supply, L.L.C., Delta Rigging & Tools, Inc., Morgan City Rentals, Spartan Industrial Products.(Malish, Jedd) Modified on 3/14/2017 (cg)(3ccUSM) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Warrant for Arrest of Vessel | ||
2 | 2
motion
Appoint/Substitute Custodian
Tue 03/14 11:14 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint/Substitute Custodian by Bayou Black Electric Supply, L.L.C., Delta Rigging & Tools, Inc., Morgan City Rentals, Spartan Industrial Products.(Malish, Jedd) Modified on 3/14/2017 (cg)(3ccUSM) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 11:12 AM
COMPLAINT against D.B William Kallop, Offshore Specialty Fabricators, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6022893) filed by Delta Rigging & Tools, Inc., Spartan Industrial Products, Bayou Black Electric Supply, L.L.C., Morgan City Rentals.Attorney Jedd Spencer Malish added to party Bayou Black Electric Supply, L.L.C.(pty:pla), Attorney Jedd Spencer Malish added to party Delta Rigging & Tools, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Jedd Spencer Malish added to party Morgan City Rentals(pty:pla), Attorney Jedd Spencer Malish added to party Spartan Industrial Products(pty:pla).(Malish, Jedd) Modified on 3/14/2017 (cg)(3ccUSM) |
|
Att: 1 Verification of Chris Lapeyrouse, | ||
Att: 2 Verification of Brian Pellegrin, | ||
Att: 3 Verification of Brad Guidry, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit of Jedd S. Malish, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Summons |