Roche v. Bank of America, N.A.
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nannette Jolivette Brown |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02110 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 12:2601 Real Estate Settlement Procedures Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 3:49 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darlene Roche
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Mon 07/31 8:22 AM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that all claims asserted in the Petition to Annul Sheriff's Sale, For Preliminary and Permanent Injunction, and for Damages filed by Plaintiff against BANA are dismissed in their entirety with prejudice, without the right to renew, and with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this action be, and is hereby, dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/28/2017.(mmv) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 07/28 10:48 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Darlene Roche and by Bank of America, N.A.(Deethardt, Mark) Modified text on 7/28/2017 (jls) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment | ||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 05/01 10:00 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action be and is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty days, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the compromise agreed upon by the parties. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties be directed to file an appropriate order of dismissal as soon as the settlement documents are executed. If no motion to reopen is filed, the case is officially closed and the Clerk of Court shall be relieved of responsibility of sending out further notices in this matter. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 4/28/2017.(mmv) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Supplemental Memorandum
Mon 04/24 2:27 PM
Reply Memorandum in Support of Objection to Notice of Removal filed by Darlene Roche and7 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (mmv) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 04/24 2:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING15 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Objection to Notice of Removal and Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 4/24/2017. (mmv) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 04/21 12:47 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Objection to Notice of Removal and Motion to Remand to State Court with Certificate of Service, re rec. doc. 7, by Darlene Roche.(Sartorio, Anthony) Modified text on 4/21/2017 (jls) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading | ||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Tue 04/18 9:20 AM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Bank of America, N.A. re7 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Deethardt, Mark) Modified text on 4/18/2017 (jls) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 04/12 1:22 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the12 Motion is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the submission date on the11 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A. is hereby reset from April 26, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. to May 10, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 4/12/2017.(mmv) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Continue
Tue 04/11 4:30 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue /Reset with Certificate of Service by Darlene Roche.(Sartorio, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6)
Mon 04/10 1:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bank of America, N.A. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/26/2017.(Deethardt, Mark) Modified text on 4/10/2017 (jls) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Notice of Submission | ||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
minutes
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 03/28 4:24 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the9 Motion is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the submission date on the7 Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Darlene Roche is hereby reset from April 12, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. to April 26, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/28/2017.(mmv) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Continue
Mon 03/27 2:39 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Reset Submission Date on rec. doc. 7 by Bank of America, N.A.(Deethardt, Mark) Modified text on 3/27/2017 (mmv) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 03/22 10:26 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re7 MOTION to Remand to State Court with certificate of service . **Image (Exhibit 1) filed sideways. Clerk has corrected image. Please adjust scanner for future filings. No further action necessary.** (mmv) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Remand to State Court
Tue 03/21 3:06 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court with certificate of service by Darlene Roche. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/12/2017.(Sartorio, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 (proces verbal of sale), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Notice of Submission, | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of service | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 03/21 12:43 PM
ORDER GRANTING5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal as to Bank of America, N.A. answer due 4/10/2017. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/21/2017. (mmv) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 03/20 10:25 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal by Bank of America, N.A.(Deethardt, Mark) Modified text on 3/20/2017 (mmv) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
misc
Statement of Corporate Disclosure
Mon 03/20 10:22 AM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Bank of America, N.A. (Deethardt, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 03/15 2:44 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Judge Susie Morgan no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/15/2017.(cg) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 03/14 11:47 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (jeg) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 03/14 11:34 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty-Fourth Judicial District Court, case number 768-897 (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Bank of America, N.A..Attorney Mark R. Deethardt added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft).(Deethardt, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 03/14 3:38 PM
Filing fee received from Bank of America, N.A.: (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number LAE043003) (jeg) |