Farlough et al v United States of America
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lance M Africk |
Referred: | Janis Van Meerveld |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02129 |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Cause | 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 3:32 AM CDT |
Defendant
Jacob Stein
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
University Healthcare System, L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Angela Traylor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joseph Tarsia
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sabre A. Patton-Fee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Enrique Palacios
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kristina Lafaye
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Health Care Indemnity, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Laveil Allen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hilton Farlough
Kara Hadican Samuels 935 Gravier Street Suite 1150 New Orleans
New Orleans, LA 70112 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Faith Farlough
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Cross Claimant
Angela Traylor
Terminated: 06/14/2017
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Joseph Tarsia
Terminated: 06/14/2017
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Jacob Stein
Terminated: 06/14/2017
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Sabre A. Patton-Fee
Terminated: 06/14/2017
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Enrique Palacios
Terminated: 06/14/2017
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Kristina Lafaye
Terminated: 06/14/2017
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Laveil Allen
Terminated: 06/14/2017
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund
Terminated: 06/14/2017
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
United States of America
Terminated: 06/14/2017
|
|
Defendant
Akhil A. Parulkar
Terminated: 06/16/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
63 | 63
misc
Transcript
Fri 01/26 2:05 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on January 24, 2018 before Judge Lance M. Africk. Court Reporter/Recorder Lanie Smith, Telephone number 504-589-7782. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2018. (rsg) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
62 | 62
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 01/25 11:50 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/24/2018.(blg) |
|
61 | 61
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 01/25 11:29 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Settlement Conference held on 1/24/2018. (blg) |
|
60 | 60
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 01/25 8:57 AM
This Court has been advised that the case has settled. Counsel are thanked for their assistance. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/24/2018.(blg) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
59 | 59
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Party
Wed 01/24 9:36 AM
ORDER granting58 Motion to Dismiss Party. All claims asserted against Dr. Kristina Lafaye, as well as all claims asserted against the Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund strictly in its capacity of Dr. Lafaye's employer, in this case are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/23/2018. (blg) |
|
58 | 58
motion
Dismiss Party
Tue 01/23 12:34 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Dr. Kristina Lafaye and Administrators of the Tulane Educational Fund Strictly in the Capacity as Her Employer by Faith Farlough, Hilton Farlough.(Samuels, Kara) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |