Kitty Carter et al v. U S A et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert G James |
Referred: | Karen L Hayes |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00397 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:2674 Federal Tort Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 3:49 AM CDT |
Defendant
Green Clinic
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Hebert
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lammico
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tika Ranjitkar
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
USA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffrey Weeks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kitty Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glen Carter Estate
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Louisiana Medical Mutual Insurance Co
Terminated: 04/25/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Thu 03/08 5:06 PM
JUDGMENT granting27 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims and causes of action asserted by Plaintiffs against Defendants are Dismissed With Prejudice, with all parties to bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 3/8/2018. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Wed 03/07 9:23 AM
JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by USA, Brandon Carter, Eric Carter, Kitty Carter, Glen Carter Estate , and Defendants, Tika Ranjitkar, John Hebert, Green Clinic, Jeffrey Weeks and Lammico.(aty,Johnson, Andolyn) Modified filers on 3/7/2018 (Bunting, M) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order Dismissing Case (30, 60, 90 day)
Tue 01/09 11:52 AM
ELECTRONIC 60 DAY ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Court having been advised by counsel that the above civil action has been settled, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is administratively terminated, without prejudice to the right of the parties to re-open the proceedings. All pending motions are denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within sixty (60) days of the date this Order is entered, the parties submit to the Court a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal signed by all parties who have appeared in this action, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 1/9/2018. (crt,Floyd, J) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 01/09 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by USA. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension (Other)
Wed 11/22 4:13 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines. Plaintiffs Witness List due by 1/8/2018. Defendants Witness List due by 1/19/2018. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 2/6/2018. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 3/2/2018. Written Discovery due by 2/6/2018. Discovery due by 3/2/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 3/12/2018. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 11/22/2017. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Extension (Other)
Wed 11/22 3:36 PM
MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Pretrial Order Deadlines with consent by John Hebert. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes.(aty,Pugh, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Mon 07/03 12:11 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Andolyn Reeves Johnson for USA. Attorney Joseph P Landreneau terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/3/2017. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 06/30 4:38 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney Andolyn R. Johnson in place of Joseph P. Landreneau with consent sought but not yet obtained by USA. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes.(aty,Landreneau, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order - James
Fri 06/16 3:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/11/2018 at 9:00 AM in Monroe, 2nd floor before Judge Robert G James. Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Pretrial Order due by 5/7/2018. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 10/26/2017. Plaintiffs Witness List due by 11/24/2017. Defendants Witness List due by 12/5/2017. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 12/22/2017. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 1/24/2018. Discovery deadline 12/22/2017. Discovery II due by 1/24/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 2/8/2018. Expert Depositions due by 3/20/2018. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 4/17/2018. Motions in Limine due by 4/13/2018. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 6/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 6/16/2017. (crt,Miletello, A) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Jurisdictional Review Finding
Tue 06/13 4:17 PM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to 28 USC 1346. This finding does NOT decide the jurisdictional issues raised by the United States in the Rule 26 report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 6/13/2017. (jud,Hayes, Karen) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Thu 06/08 12:09 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT RULE 26(f) Report by Brandon Carter, Eric Carter, Kitty Carter, Glen Carter Estate , and Defendants, USA, Tika Ranjitkar, John Hebert, Green Clinic, Jeffrey Weeks, Lammico . (aty,Shoenfelt, Oscar) Modified filers on 6/8/2017 (Bunting, M) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/23 2:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by USA.(Attorney Joseph P Landreneau added to party USA(pty:dft))(aty,Landreneau, Joseph) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 05/19 2:44 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lammico. (aty,Pugh, Robert) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/19 2:27 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by John Hebert, Lammico.(Attorney Robert G Pugh, Jr added to party John Hebert(pty:dft), Attorney Robert G Pugh, Jr added to party Lammico(pty:dft))(aty,Pugh, Robert) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Case Management Order - Judge James
Mon 05/15 3:56 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Robert G James sent to pending counsel of record. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 5/15/2017. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/25 2:35 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Louisiana Medical Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,James, Gordon) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/25 2:27 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Green Clinic, Louisiana Medical Mutual Insurance Co, Tika Ranjitkar, Jeffrey Weeks.(Attorney Gordon Lee James added to party Green Clinic(pty:dft), Attorney Gordon Lee James added to party Louisiana Medical Mutual Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Gordon Lee James added to party Tika Ranjitkar(pty:dft), Attorney Gordon Lee James added to party Jeffrey Weeks(pty:dft))(aty,James, Gordon) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/21 10:35 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Carter, Brandon Carter, Kitty Carter, Glen Carter Estate USA thru Sonya Cromwell, VA Chief Counsel, Dept of Veterans Affairs .(aty,Shoenfelt, Oscar) Modified service information to include the name of the party served on 4/21/2017 (Bunting, M) |
|
Att: 1 Green Card re Proof of Service - VA, Chief Counsel | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/21 10:33 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Carter, Brandon Carter, Kitty Carter, Glen Carter Estate. USA thru David J Shulkin Secretary, U S Dept of Veterans Affairs served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017.(aty,Shoenfelt, Oscar) Modified service information to include name of party served on 4/21/2017 (Bunting, M) |
|
Att: 1 Green Card re Proof of Service - VA | ||
notice
Notice of Corrective Action
Fri 04/21 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding9 Summons Returned Executed. Action taken: docket text modified to reflect Summons Returned Unexecuted - Service of the complaint is not considered properly executed (service within the State of Louisiana cannot be effected through certified mail); therefore answer deadline has been terminated and serviced executed date removed. (crt,Bunting, M) |
||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/20 5:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Carter, Brandon Carter, Kitty Carter, Glen Carter Estate.(aty,Shoenfelt, Oscar) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment-Copy of Green Card Evidencing Service | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/20 4:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Carter, Brandon Carter, Kitty Carter, Glen Carter Estate. USA served on 3/28/2017, answer due 4/18/2017.(aty,Shoenfelt, Oscar) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment-Copy of Green Card Evidencing Service | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 04/20 3:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eric Carter, Brandon Carter, Kitty Carter, Glen Carter Estate. Louisiana Medical Mutual Insurance Co waiver sent on 3/27/2017, answer due 5/26/2017. (aty,Shoenfelt, Oscar) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 04/20 3:41 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eric Carter, Brandon Carter, Kitty Carter, Glen Carter Estate. Tika Ranjitkar waiver sent on 3/21/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (aty,Shoenfelt, Oscar) |
|
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 04/20 3:39 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eric Carter, Brandon Carter, Kitty Carter, Glen Carter Estate. Green Clinic waiver sent on 3/21/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (aty,Shoenfelt, Oscar) |
|
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 04/20 3:38 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eric Carter, Brandon Carter, Kitty Carter, Glen Carter Estate. Jeffrey Weeks waiver sent on 3/21/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (aty,Shoenfelt, Oscar) |
|
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 04/20 3:36 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eric Carter, Brandon Carter, Kitty Carter, Glen Carter Estate. John Hebert waiver sent on 3/21/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (aty,Shoenfelt, Oscar) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued - USA (Form Included)
Thu 03/16 11:04 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, LAMMICO, Tika Ranjitkar, John Hebert, Green Clinic, Jeffrey Weeks (crt,FinnSld, P) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 3:33 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3314240) filed by Eric Carter, Brandon Carter, Kitty Carter, Estate of Glen Carter on Behalf of Glen Carter (Deceased).(Attorney Oscar L Shoenfelt, III added to party Brandon Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Oscar L Shoenfelt, III added to party Eric Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Oscar L Shoenfelt, III added to party Kitty Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Oscar L Shoenfelt, III added to party Estate of Glen Carter on Behalf of Glen Carter (Deceased)(pty:selreq))(aty,Shoenfelt, Oscar) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/16 11:01 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Robert G James and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,FinnSld, P) |