Rosberg v. State of Nebraska et al
Nebraska District Court | |
Judge: | Richard G Kopf |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00080 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 3:24 AM CDT |
Defendant
State of Nebraska
|
|
Defendant
Paul J. Vaughan
|
|
Plaintiff
Paul A. Rosberg
87288 543 Avenue
Wausa, NE 68786 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment - Pro Se
Wed 04/26 10:42 AM
JUDGMENT - This case is dismissed with prejudice for the reasons discussed in the Memorandum and Order entered on this date. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC) |
|
Att: 1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Hearing
Wed 04/26 10:39 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that this action is dismissed with prejudice because Plaintiff's Complaint is frivolous and fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The court will enter judgment by separate order. Plaintiff's motion for hearing and stay of divorce proceedings (Filing No.6 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Hearing
Mon 03/20 2:01 PM
MOTION for Hearing on behalf of Plaintiff Paul A. Rosberg. (LAC) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Memorandum and Order ~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 03/17 9:17 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Leave to proceed in forma pauperis2 is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order - Pro Se GO 2016-02
Tue 03/14 2:05 PM
GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG) |
|
3 | 3
oth_evt
Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)
Tue 03/14 2:02 PM
NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (GJG) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 1:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Paul A. Rosberg. (GJG) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Pro Se
Tue 03/14 1:52 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against State of Nebraska and Paul J. Vaughan. No Summons(es) issued. Filed by Plaintiff Paul A. Rosberg. (GJG) |