Johnson v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | A Joe Fish |
Referred: | Rebecca Rutherford |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00720 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 01, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 03/06 10:34 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:21. Tue Mar 6 10:34:36 CST 2018 (crt) |
||
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 03/02 9:55 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:19, 20. Fri Mar 2 09:55:02 CST 2018 (crt) |
||
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Judgment
Fri 03/02 9:54 AM
JUDGMENT: The petition is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust state remedies. [15 Administrative Record] (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/1/2018) (axm) |
|
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Fri 03/02 9:52 AM
Order Accepting Findings and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/1/2018) (axm) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Hearing Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 02/06 5:05 PM
ORDER denying11 Motion for Discovery Hearing.; denying12 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing.; denying13 Motion to Expand the Record. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 2/6/2018) (ndt) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Tue 02/06 5:02 PM
Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation on Case re:3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Antonio Johnson. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 2/6/2018) (ndt) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 02/06 5:05 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:18,19. Tue Feb 6 17:05:19 CST 2018 (crt) |
||
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 01/29 1:38 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:17. Mon Jan 29 13:38:49 CST 2018 (crt) |
||
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 01/29 10:32 AM
SPECIAL ORDER NO. 3-316: All matters referred to Magistrate Judge Stickney are automatically referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford unless otherwise directed by the presiding district judge. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 1/26/2018) (ctf) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Mon 05/08 8:46 AM
RESPONSE to3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Patton, Rachel) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Administrative Record
Mon 05/08 8:44 AM
Administrative Record consisting of State court papers filed by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Patton, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 WR-81,526-01 Action Taken, | ||
Att: 2 WR-81,526-01 Address Verification, | ||
Att: 3 WR-81,526-01 Copy Rqt Pro Se 5 6-2016 | ||
Att: 4 WR-81,526-01 Mtn Rcvd Pro Se 11 30-2016 | ||
Att: 5 WR-81,526-01 Writ Rcvd | ||
14 | 14
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 05/08 8:42 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Patton, Rachel) (Main Document 14 replaced on 5/9/2017) with "flattened" document (dss) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 04/27 12:21 PM
MOTION to Expand the Record filed by Antonio Johnson. (sss) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Hearing
Thu 04/27 12:20 PM
MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing filed by Antonio Johnson. (sss) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Hearing
Thu 04/27 12:18 PM
MOTION for Discovery Hearing filed by Antonio Johnson. (sss) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 03/30 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel Leigh Patton on behalf of Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Patton, Rachel) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 03/17 11:30 AM
Notice of electronic service made to the Office of the Attorney General of Texas re: petition and all Orders. (sss) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer
Fri 03/17 11:26 AM
ORDER REQUIRING RESPONDENT TO SHOW CAUSE AND NOTICE AND INSTRUCTIONS TO PARTIES: The clerk will electronically serve this order, the petition, and supporting documents to the designee for the Office of the Texas Attorney General. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 3/17/2017) (sss) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/17 11:23 AM
ORDER PERMITTING PROCEEDING IN THE DISTRICT COURT AND SPECIFYING FURTHER ACTION TO BE TAKEN BY THE CLERK. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 3/17/2017) (sss) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 03/17 10:38 AM
ORDER: Petitioner filed a motion for a copy of his trial transcripts. (ECF No.5 .) He states he needs the transcripts to show that his counsel was ineffective and that counsel took advantage of his "mental aberration." Respondent will file a copy of the trial transcripts with the Court. Petitioner's motion is denied without prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 3/17/2017) (sss) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 03/17 10:38 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri Mar 17 10:38:51 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 03/17 11:57 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7, 8. Fri Mar 17 11:57:05 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/17 1:14 PM
Petition, supporting documents, if any, and Order(s) received by Office of Attorney General of Texas. Laura L Haney received on 3/17/2017. (twd) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 03/14 12:40 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Tue Mar 14 12:40:19 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 03/14 12:39 PM
MOTION for Trial Transcripts filed by Antonio Johnson. (aaa) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 12:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Antonio Johnson. (aaa) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 03/14 12:37 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Antonio Johnson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (aaa) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Tue 03/14 12:36 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (aaa) |
|
1 | 1
qcref
Fish
Tue 03/14 12:34 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Stickney (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa) |