Hurt 123 Marketing LLC v. Uvalle Law Firm PLLC
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | David C Godbey |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00738 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 3:35 AM CDT |
Defendant
Uvalle Law Firm PLLC
5400 Lyndon B. johnson Fwy Suite 900
Dallas, TX 75240 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hurt 123 Marketing LLC
2450 Hollywood Blvd. Suite 500
Hollywood, FL 33020 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
3
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Thu 05/25 4:30 PM
ORDER: The Court denies the2 request for preliminary injunction without prejudice. The Court directs the Clerk to administratively close this case without prejudice to its being reopened. The remaining pending motions in this case are accordingly moot. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/25/2017) (twd) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
7
pgs
respm
Reply
Mon 05/22 5:16 PM
REPLY filed by Uvalle Law Firm PLLC re:21 MOTION to Strike18 Affidavit and Expert Report of Dr. Aner Sela in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Stanton, James) |
|
28 | 28
6
pgs
respm
Reply
Mon 05/22 5:12 PM
REPLY filed by Uvalle Law Firm PLLC re:20 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Stanton, James) |
|
27 | 27
8
pgs
respm
Reply
Mon 05/22 5:07 PM
REPLY filed by Uvalle Law Firm PLLC re:19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Stanton, James) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
5
pgs
misc
Status Report
Mon 05/15 4:56 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT and Scheduling Conference Report filed by Hurt 123 Marketing LLC. (Blanco, Ileana) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
13
pgs
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 05/08 2:08 PM
RESPONSE filed by Hurt 123 Marketing LLC re:21 MOTION to Strike18 Affidavit and Expert Report of Dr. Aner Sela in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Blanco, Ileana) |
|
24 | 24
4
pgs
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 05/08 2:06 PM
RESPONSE filed by Hurt 123 Marketing LLC re:20 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Blanco, Ileana) |
|
23 | 23
9
pgs
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 05/08 2:04 PM
RESPONSE filed by Hurt 123 Marketing LLC re:19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Blanco, Ileana) |
|
Att: 1 19 pgs Exhibit(s) A | ||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Status Report Order
Fri 04/28 2:45 PM
ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/28/2017) (axm) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
8
pgs
motion
Strike
Thu 04/27 11:26 PM
MOTION to Strike18 Affidavit and Expert Report of Dr. Aner Sela in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Uvalle Law Firm PLLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Stanton, James) |
|
20 | 20
3
pgs
motion
Leave to File
Thu 04/27 11:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Uvalle Law Firm PLLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Stanton, James) |
|
Att: 1 66 pgs Exhibit(s) Defendant's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction | ||
19 | 19
15
pgs
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 04/27 10:56 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim() filed by Uvalle Law Firm PLLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Stanton, James) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
22
pgs
misc
Affidavit
Mon 04/17 3:57 PM
Declaration and Expert Report of Dr. Aner Sela re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Hurt 123 Marketing LLC. (Blanco, Ileana) Modified text on 4/18/2017 . |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 04/14 2:31 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eliot T Burriss is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiff Hurt 123 Marketing LLC. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/14/2017) (bdb) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
7
pgs
respm
Response/Objection
Thu 04/06 5:51 PM
RESPONSE filed by Hurt 123 Marketing LLC re:9 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Figueroa, Xenia) |
|
15 | 15
12
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 04/06 5:45 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Uvalle Law Firm PLLC filed by Hurt 123 Marketing LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Figueroa, Xenia) |
|
Att: 1 12 pgs Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 3 16 pgs Exhibit(s) C, | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit(s) D, | ||
Att: 5 1 pgs Exhibit(s) E | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 04/06 12:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Eliot Burriss filed by Hurt 123 Marketing LLC (Figueroa, Xenia) |
|
13 | 13
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 04/06 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Xenia Nicole Figueroa on behalf of Hurt 123 Marketing LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Figueroa, Xenia) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 04/05 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ileana M Blanco on behalf of Hurt 123 Marketing LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Blanco, Ileana) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for TRO
Mon 03/27 4:58 PM
ORDER: The Court denies Hurt 123's2 motion for temporary restraining order. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/27/2017) (sss) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
11
pgs
respm
Reply
Fri 03/24 9:29 PM
REPLY filed by Hurt 123 Marketing LLC re:2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant (Burriss, Eliot) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Declaration(s) of Alon Barzakay | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
21
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Tue 03/21 6:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Uvalle Law Firm PLLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support.Attorney James M Stanton added to party Uvalle Law Firm PLLC(pty:dft) (Stanton, James) |
|
Att: 1 22 pgs Exhibit(s) Appendix to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned
Mon 03/20 2:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Uvalle Law Firm PLLC ; served on 3/16/2017. (ndt) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/17 11:25 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jorge T. Espinosa. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/17/2017) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/16 3:44 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8281458) filed by Hurt 123 Marketing LLCAttorney Jorge Espinosa added to party Hurt 123 Marketing LLC(pty:pla) (Espinosa, Jorge) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 2:14 PM
Summons Issued as to Uvalle Law Firm PLLC. (ndt) |
|
4 | 4
qcref
Godbey
Tue 03/14 2:12 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/14 1:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hurt123. (Burriss, Eliot) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Tue 03/14 1:15 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant filed by Hurt123 with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Burriss, Eliot) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 1:12 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Uvalle Law Firm, PLLC filed by Hurt 123 Marketing LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8274600) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Burriss, Eliot) Modified on 3/14/2017 (ndt) |
|
Att: 1 13 pgs Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E, | ||
Att: 6 Cover Sheet |