Omega Psi Phi Fraternity Inc v. Odimegwu et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Renee Harris Toliver |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00750 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 3:38 AM CDT |
Defendant
Raymond Odimegwu
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
African Imports USA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Omega Psi Phi Fraternity Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 71 minutes ago |
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office
Tue 10/03 1:54 PM
Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Final Order. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ams) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation
Tue 10/03 12:57 PM
First STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL filed by Omega Psi Phi Fraternity Inc. (Brown, Rodney) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order of Dismissal | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Public Entry)
Tue 10/03 1:47 PM
Civil Case Terminated per21 First Stipulation of Dismissal. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (ams) |
||
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
4
pgs
order
Order
Tue 09/19 9:02 AM
STANDING ORDER ON ALL NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS (see order for specifics). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 9/18/2017) (mcrd) |
|
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 09/19 9:00 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties and Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2018. Discovery due by 5/1/2018. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/15/2018. Joint Estimate of Trial Length and Status Report due by 5/22/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 5/29/2018. Pretrial Order and Pretrial Materials due by 9/10/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2018 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1409, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. Bench Trial set for 9/24/2018 in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1409, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 9/18/2017) (mcrd) Modified on 9/19/2017 (mcrd) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge/Order Reassigning Case
Tue 09/05 11:10 AM
CONSENT to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by all parties and Order Reassigning Case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver for all further proceedings. Judge Sidney A Fitzwater no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 9/5/2017) (ams) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order
Fri 08/25 11:29 AM
Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Omega Psi Phi Fraternity Inc. (Brown, Rodney) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal
Fri 07/28 3:49 PM
ORDER: Joint Scheduling Proposal due by 8/25/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/28/2017) (twd) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/25 10:50 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by African Imports USA, Raymond Odimegwu. (Joe, Christopher) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/24 6:26 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by African Imports USA, Raymond Odimegwu. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Christopher M Joe added to party African Imports USA(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher M Joe added to party Raymond Odimegwu(pty:dft) (Joe, Christopher) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned
Mon 07/10 2:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Raymond Odimegwu ; served on 7/1/2017. (Brown, Rodney) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) Additional Service of Process | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned
Mon 07/10 2:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to African Imports USA ; served on 7/8/2017. (Brown, Rodney) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Mon 07/03 9:37 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Extend Time to File Service of Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that Proof of Service in this matter must be filed with The Clerk of Court on or before 7/10/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/3/2017) (ran) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 06/30 3:19 PM
First MOTION to Extend Time to File Service of Complaint filed by Omega Psi Phi Fraternity Inc (Brown, Rodney) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension | ||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/27 7:56 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rodney A. Brown. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/27/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/27 12:59 AM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8499854) filed by Omega Psi Phi Fraternity Inc (Brown, Rodney) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer
Wed 06/14 8:19 AM
ORDER. The court orders that plaintiff demonstrate good cause for failing to effect service on defendants. This must be done by filing a written response with the clerk of court no later than 7/5/2017. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/14/2017) (epm) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/29 8:28 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rodney A. Brown. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/29/2017) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/28 10:41 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8307333) filed by Omega Psi Phi Fraternity Inc (Brown, Rodney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office
Wed 03/15 10:04 AM
Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (epm) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/15 9:55 AM
Summons Issued as to African Imports USA, Raymond Odimegwu. (epm) |
|
2 | 2
qcref
Fitzwater
Wed 03/15 9:52 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 10:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Raymond Odimegwu filed by Omega Psi Phi Fraternity Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8275942) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Brown, Rodney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |