Palomino v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert Pitman |
Referred: | Andrew W Austin |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00233 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 4:24 AM CDT |
Defendant
The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edwardo Garcia Palomino
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Lincoln National Corporation
Terminated: 04/13/2017
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
utility
Notice of Correction
Fri 05/26 8:21 AM
Notice of Correction: re13 Stipulation of Dismissal. This document is deficient as this case was Transferred to the Pecos Division on 04/17/17 pursuant to 12 Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Transfer Case. Please refile this document in their civil case, 4:17-cv-18. (klw) (klw) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 05/25 2:23 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice [by Plaintiff Edwardo Garcia Palomino] and by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Davidoff, Bill) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Transfer Case
Tue 04/18 7:26 AM
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's9 Motion to Transfer Case to the WD/TX, Pecos Division. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/17 4:53 PM
Text Order GRANTING10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant's Answer or otherwise responsive pleading is due on or before May 22, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Tue 04/18 7:55 AM
Reset Deadlines: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company answer due 5/22/2017. (klw) |
||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 04/13 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bill E. Davidoff on behalf of The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Attorney Bill E. Davidoff added to party The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Davidoff, Bill) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 04/13 4:36 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re4 Complaint by Lincoln National Corporation, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Davidoff, Bill) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
motion
Transfer Case
Thu 04/13 4:21 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case by Edwardo Garcia Palomino. (Diamond, Jeffrey) |
|
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 04/13 3:50 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Under ERISA for Recovery of Disability Insurance Benefits against Lincoln National Corporation amending4 Complaint., filed by Edwardo Garcia Palomino.(Diamond, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Remark
Tue 04/04 12:49 PM
Request for payment of $65.53 for Summons Returned Executed by the USMS. (klw) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/04 12:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Lincoln National Corporation served on 3/31/2017, answer due 4/21/2017. (klw) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/30 11:18 AM
Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Corporation. (ml) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/30 10:32 AM
COMPLAINT, filed by Edwardo Garcia Palomino.(ml) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/30 10:29 AM
ORDER GRANTING1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk to issue summons in this case and orders the United States Marshal's Service to attempt service in this case without pre-payment of a service fee. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml) |
|
utility
Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/30 10:29 AM
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Attachment
Tue 03/14 3:12 PM
Civil Cover Sheet to1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edwardo Garcia Palomino. (Diamond, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/14/2017 to amend title (gr) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 2:36 PM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edwardo Garcia Palomino.(Diamond, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/14 3:45 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (gr) |
||
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Tue 03/14 3:46 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin. (gr) |