Hill v. Acosta et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | David A Ezra |
Referred: | John W Primomo |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00198 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Amend Judgment
Thu 06/01 4:56 PM
ORDER DENYING5 Motion to Amend Judgment Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Amend Judgment
Mon 04/24 8:59 AM
Text Order REFERRING5 Motion to Amend Judgment to Pro Se Law Clerk. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc) |
||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Amend Judgment
Fri 04/21 11:27 AM
PRO-SE MOTION to Amend or Alter Judgment filed by Tracy A. Hill. (wg) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judgment
Wed 03/22 1:04 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 03/22 1:02 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE, GRANTED re2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tracy A. Hill, Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a Non-Frivolous Claim. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this Order to the Custodian of the Inmate Trust Fund, also to the "Keeper of the Three Strikes List",. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg) |
|
utility
Motions No Longer Referred
Wed 03/22 1:05 PM
Motions No Longer Referred:2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis (wg) |
||
utility
Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/22 1:28 PM
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John W. Primomo. (wg) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 9:05 AM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tracy A. Hill.. Motions referred to Judge John W. Primomo. (fs) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 9:04 AM
COMPLAINT, filed by Tracy A. Hill.(fs) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Copy of Envelope |