Casillas v. CitiMortgage, Inc.
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Xavier Rodriguez |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00200 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 3:32 AM CDT |
Defendant
CitiMortgage, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roland Casillas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
utility
Notice of Correction
Mon 10/23 9:25 AM
Notice of Correction:***NOTIFIED COUNSEL TO DISREGAED FILING - FILED IN ERROR*** re 6 Status Report. (aej) |
||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 04/13 4:25 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (aej) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 04/13 10:55 AM
ORDER GRANTING3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez (aej) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss
Mon 03/20 11:32 AM
MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by CitiMortgage, Inc..(Curran, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Tue 03/14 1:52 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Curran, Charles) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 03/14 1:46 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CitiMortgage, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-9390759), filed by CitiMortgage, Inc..(Curran, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/14 2:17 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rf) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Tue 03/14 2:17 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (rf) |