Evanston Insurance Company v. CBB Commercial Contracting
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | David A Ezra |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00201 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 4:17 AM CDT |
Defendant
CCB Commercial Contracting, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Evanston Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 09/21 10:35 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (rf) |
|
20 | 20
3
pgs
order
Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 09/21 9:13 AM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for17 Report and Recommendations, GRANTING10 MOTION Default Declaratory Judgment. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Fri 09/08 3:23 PM
Certified Mail Receipt Returned of18 Certified Mail Receipt (mgr) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Fri 09/01 3:39 PM
Certified Mail Receipt of17 Report and Recommendations (mgr) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Report and Recommendations
Fri 09/01 2:19 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re10 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Evanston Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S Chestney. (mgr) |
|
utility
Motions No Longer Referred
Tue 09/05 2:21 PM
Motions No Longer Referred:10 MOTION (mgr) |
||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Mon 07/24 4:25 PM
Certified Mail Receipt of12 Certified Mail Receipt (mgr) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Mon 07/24 4:24 PM
Certified Mail Receipt of12 Certified Mail Receipt (mgr) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Mon 07/24 4:20 PM
Certified Mail Receipt of12 Certified Mail Receipt (mgr) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Thu 07/20 2:04 PM
Certified Mail Receipt of1 Complaint,10 MOTION,11 Order,9 Clerk's Entry of Default (rf) |
|
misc
Remark (No Doc#)
Fri 07/21 11:53 AM
Per Order11 documents #1, #10, #11 & #9 were also sent via USPS. (mgr) Modified on 7/21/2017, to correct date (mgr) |
||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Wed 07/19 11:30 AM
ORDER. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S Chestney. (mgr) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Ex Parte Motion
Wed 07/12 8:32 AM
Text Order REFERRING 10 Ex Parte Motion to Magistrate Judge Chestney. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vh) |
||
utility
Motions Referred
Wed 07/12 9:09 AM
EX PARTE MOTION REFERRED: referred 10 EX PARTE MOTION. Referral Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney. (mgr) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 06/23 11:18 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to CCB Commercial Contracting, LLC (rf) |
|
utility
Motions No Longer Referred
Fri 06/23 11:02 AM
Motions No Longer Referred:8 MOTION for Entry of Default (Motion referred in error) (rf) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Wed 06/21 8:01 AM
Text Order REFERRING8 Motion for Entry of Default to Magistrate Judge Chestney. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vh) |
||
utility
Motions Referred
Wed 06/21 9:25 AM
MOTION REFERRED: referred8 MOTION for Entry of Default. Referral Judge: Elizabeth S Chestney. (mgr) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Entry of Default
Tue 06/20 10:59 AM
Interim MOTION for Entry of Default against CCB Commercial Contracting LLC d/b/a Cantera Custom Builders, also known as Commercial Contract LLC and Cantera Custon Building Commercial Contracting LLC by Evanston Insurance Company.(Hoffman, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/20/2017, to correct relief (rf) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Non-Military Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit In Support of Default, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/23 10:05 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evanston Insurance Company. CCB Commercial Contracting, LLC served on 5/22/2017, answer due 6/12/2017. (Hoffman, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/23/2017, to correct service and answer dates (rf) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Tue 05/23 4:48 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: CCB Commercial Contracting, LLC answer due 6/12/2017. (rf) |
||
utility
Notice of Correction
Tue 05/23 4:49 PM
Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN EDITED TO REFLECT THE CORRECT SERVICE (5/22/17) AND ANSWER (6/12/17) DATES***** re7 Summons Returned Executed. (rf) |
||
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 05/04 4:13 PM
Summons Issued as to CCB Commercial Contracting, LLC. (rf) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 05/04 3:41 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Evanston Insurance Company. (Hoffman, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Fri 04/07 1:46 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Hoffman, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 4:49 PM
Summons Issued as to CBB Commercial Contracting, LLC. (rf) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/14 3:56 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Evanston Insurance Company. (Hoffman, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 3:52 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9391561), filed by Evanston Insurance Company.(Hoffman, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/14 4:32 PM
Case Assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rf) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Tue 03/14 4:32 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (rf) |