Great American Duck Races Incorporated v. DGL Group LTD
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00763 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 1:37 AM MST |
Defendant
DGL Group Limited
|
|
Plaintiff
Great American Duck Races Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 06/21 9:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ATD) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action
Fri 06/16 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Great American Duck Races Incorporated.(Montecuollo, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Mon 03/27 3:27 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/27/2017. (DGC, nvo) |
|
9 | 9
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 03/27 3:12 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge David G. Campbell. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-17-763-PHX-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
8 | 8
misc
25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge
Mon 03/27 3:10 PM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Report - Other
Wed 03/15 12:05 PM
REPORT of Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Plaintiff Great American Duck Races Incorporated. (Adams, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
minute_ord
~Util - Initial Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information
Tue 03/14 12:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 AO121 form | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/14 11:58 AM
Summons Issued as to DGL Group LTD. (KGM) |
|
4 | 4
misc
New Case Opened
Tue 03/14 11:54 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14013319. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David K Duncan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number:CV 17-00763 PHX-DKD. Magistrate Election form attached.(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 MAG 25 Instructions | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/14 11:52 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great American Duck Races Incorporated (submitted by Peter Montecuollo). (KGM) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Tue 03/14 11:51 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Great American Duck Races Incorporated (submitted by Peter Montecuollo). (KGM) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 11:49 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14013319 filed by Great American Duck Races Incorporated (submitted by Peter Montecuollo).(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |