Ott v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Steven P Logan |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-08051 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 11, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 28, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 11/28 10:39 AM
ORDER that the Joint Stipulation re: Attorneys' Fees (Doc.35 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that pursuant to the Court's October 24, 2019 Order (Doc.27 ), the Court affirms the award of attorneys' fees in the amount of $15,003.50 in accordance with 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). Plaintiff's attorney has already received $7,248.86 from the Agency and may keep the EAJA award of $7,248.86, leaving a remaining balance of $505.78 owed to Olinsky Law Group. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to pay Counsel the $505.78 owed, Defendant shall initiate overpayment procedures pursuant to POMS GN03920.005.C at the request of Plaintiff's Counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Hold Defendant is Contempt (Doc.28 ) is denied as moot. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/27/2023. (WLP) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Stipulation
Fri 11/17 7:34 AM
STIPULATION re: attorney's fees by Dennis Lee Ott.(Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 03, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 11/03 11:09 AM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendant shall have until November 21, 2023, to file a Response to the pending Motion to Hold Defendant in Contempt. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/1/23. (MJW) |
|
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
Fri 11/03 4:24 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Christopher Vieira appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Attorney Ryan Ta Lu terminated. . (Vieira, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 10/31 4:22 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to28 MOTION To hold Defendant in contempt unopposed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Lu, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 10/04 9:53 AM
ORDER that the Motion for Extension (Doc.30 ) is granted. Defendant shall have until 10/31/2023 to file a Response to the pending Motion to Hold Defendant in Contempt (Doc.28 ). Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 10/3/2023. (RMW) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 10/03 4:22 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to28 MOTION To hold Defendant in contempt Unopposed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Lu, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 19, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Memorandum
Tue 09/19 8:46 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of 28 MOTION To hold Defendant in contempt by Plaintiff Dennis Lee Ott.(Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Fax to Prescott District Office, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Fax to Office of Central Operations, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Fax to Payment Center 5, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Letter from SSA, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - 406(b) Partial Payment, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - EAJA Payment, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Log of Follow Up Calls, | ||
Att: 8 Certificate of Service | ||
28 | 28
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 09/19 8:28 AM
MOTION To hold Defendant in contempt by Dennis Lee Ott.(Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Thu 10/24 1:40 PM
ORDER granting the24 Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees. ORDERED that counsel is awarded $15,003.50 in accordance with 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). Upon receipt of this sum, counsel shall refund the previously awarded EAJA fees of $7,248.86 to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/24/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) |
|
Wednesday, October 23, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 10/23 10:12 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re:24 First MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §406(b)(1) filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Lu, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, October 10, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Affidavit in Support of Motion
Thu 10/10 8:06 AM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re:24 First MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §406(b)(1) filed by Dennis Lee Ott.(Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Executed Fee Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B Notification of Notice of Award, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C SSD Notice of Award, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D All Federal Court Professional Time, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E Attorney Time breakdown, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F Paralegal Time breakdown, | ||
Att: 7 Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 54.2(d)(1), | ||
Att: 8 Certificate of Service | ||
24 | 24
motion
Attorney Fees
Thu 10/10 8:04 AM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §406(b)(1) by Dennis Lee Ott.(Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Fri 02/15 12:07 PM
ORDER: The Motion20 is granted. Plaintiff shall be awarded $7,248.86 in attorney's fees and $17.67 in expenses pursuant to EAJA. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/15/2019. (REK) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 12/21 5:45 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:20 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Lu, Ryan) |
|
Saturday, December 08, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Affidavit in Support of Motion
Sat 12/08 11:48 AM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re:20 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 filed by Dennis Lee Ott.(Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- All Professional Time, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Attorney Time, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Paralegal Time, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D- Expenses, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E- Affrimation and Waiver of Direct Payment of EAJA Fees, | ||
Att: 6 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 7 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 8 Local Rule | ||
20 | 20
motion
Attorney Fees
Sat 12/08 11:44 AM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 by Dennis Lee Ott.(Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Clerks Judgment
Thu 10/11 9:04 AM
AMENDED CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Amended to correct case number and Plaintiff/Defendant names) - Pursuant to the Court's Order filed September 11, 2018, the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is vacated, and this case is remanded to the Social Security Administration for further proceedings consistent with the Order. (ATD) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Clerks Judgment
Tue 09/11 9:47 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's Order filed September 11, 2018, the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is vacated, and this case is remanded to the Social Security Administration for further proceedings consistent with the Order. (ATD) |
|
17 | 17
4
pgs
order
Order
Tue 09/11 9:43 AM
ORDER - The final decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is vacated and remanded to the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration for further proceedings consistent with this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly and terminate this action. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/10/2018. (ATD) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Brief - Reply
Wed 09/20 2:31 PM
REPLY BRIEF by Dennis Lee Ott . (Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Brief - Response
Tue 09/05 4:46 PM
RESPONSE BRIEF by Commissioner of Social Security Administration . (Lu, Ryan) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Brief - Opening
Mon 08/07 9:38 PM
OPENING BRIEF by Dennis Lee Ott . (Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Filing - Soc. Sec. Admin. Transcript
Tue 06/06 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript re:12 Answer to Complaint filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Lu, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 001 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 002 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 004 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 006 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 007 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 008 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 009 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 010 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 11 011 Medical Records Part 4, | ||
Att: 12 012 Medical Records Part 5 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 06/06 11:03 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Lu, Ryan) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Tue 06/06 7:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Ta Lu on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Lu, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service Executed
Tue 04/11 1:25 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Dennis Lee Ott: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint and Scheduling Order upon US Attorney's Office, Office of General Counsel, Attorney General on 4/7/2017. (Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/20 3:10 PM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Mon 03/20 3:09 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX183405 as to Howard D Olinsky. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 03/15 8:36 AM
Summons Issued as to SSA Office of General Counsel, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(SLQ) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
7 | 7
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/15 7:29 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Howard D. Olinsky by Dennis Lee Ott. (Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Tue 03/14 2:48 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 3/14/17. (CLB) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 2:48 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 3/14/17.(CLB) |
|
4 | 4
misc
New Case Opened
Tue 03/14 12:01 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-08051 PCT-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ATD) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Submitted
Tue 03/14 12:00 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Dennis Lee Ott. (submitted by Howard Olinsky) (ATD) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 11:59 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Long Form) by Dennis Lee Ott. (submitted by Howard Olinsky) (ATD) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 11:58 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Dennis Lee Ott. (submitted by Howard Olinsky) (ATD) |
|
Att: 1 Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |