Shirley Lindsay v. Vicente Foods, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02005 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 1:57 AM PDT |
Defendant
Vicente Foods, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Lindsay
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 12/26 2:46 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to with prejudice filed by Planitiff Shirley Lindsay.(Grace, Phyl) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
Mon 10/02 8:36 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Natsha Chesler has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Thu 08/03 12:11 PM
Effective August 7, 2017, Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 690 on the 6th Floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 690 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mailbox located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th Floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Thu 08/03 9:13 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 6/25/2018. (jp) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 08/03 9:11 AM
ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Last Day to Add Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 2/5/2018. Non-expert Discovery cut-off 5/14/2018. Last Day to Conduct ADR Proceeding is 6/11/2018. File Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit and Witness Lists, Status Report regarding settlement, and all Motions in Limine by 8/6/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/13/2018., Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 8/27/2018 at 11:00 AM. Trial Date (Est. 3-4 Days) set for 9/18/2018 at 8:30 AM. (SEE THE SECOND PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR FURTHER THE SPECIFIED DATES). (jp) |
|
17 | 17
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 08/03 9:06 AM
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Scheduling Conference held. The Court sets dates. Please see separate Order Re Jury Trial, also filed today. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (jp) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 07/17 1:03 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay.. (Price, Dennis) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 05/25 9:24 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: A Scheduling Conference is set for 7/31/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Joint Rule 26(f) Meeting Report is due 7/17/2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cw) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/24 11:03 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Vicente Foods, Inc. (Heath, Levi) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 05/24 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Vicente Foods, Inc., identifying Plaintiff Shirley Lindsday and Defendant Vicente Foods, Inc. (Heath, Levi) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 05/24 10:52 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Vicente Foods, Inc..(Heath, Levi) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 04/07 4:28 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay, re Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20),,10 served on April 6, 2017. (Potter, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Wed 04/05 8:50 AM
NOTICE to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. PLAINTIFF is directed to serve the ADA Packet on Defendant(s) at the same time the summons and complaint are served, if possible. If, upon receipt of this Notice to Parties, Plaintiff has already served Defendant(s), Plaintiff must serve the ADA Packet no later than fourteen (14) days after this Notice to Parties is filed with the Court. Within three (3) days of serving Defendant(s), Plaintiff must file with the Court a proof of service indicating that the ADA Packet was served on Defendant(s). *See Notice for further details.* (cw) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 04/04 2:08 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay, upon Defendant Vicente Foods, Inc. served on 4/2/2017, answer due 5/24/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: Michael L Adams in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) |
|
8 | 8
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 04/04 10:59 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Vicente Foods, Inc. answer now due 5/24/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Vicente Foods, Inc..(Attorney Levi William Heath added to party Vicente Foods, Inc.(pty:dft))(Heath, Levi) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 9:00 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Vicente Foods, Inc. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 8:57 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 8:56 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 4:41 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Planitiff Shirley Lindsay. (Handy, Russell) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 4:39 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay, (Handy, Russell) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 4:37 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay. (Handy, Russell) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 4:36 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19509242 - Fee: $400, filed by Planitiff Shirley Lindsay. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Shirley Lindsay(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) |