Michael Rocca v. Jayhal Family, Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | John E Mcdermott |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02010 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 1:38 AM PDT |
Defendant
Jayhal Family, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Laxmi Hospitality, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Rocca
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 05/18 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Michael Rocca. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/10 10:46 AM
NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Michael Rocca. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Fri 05/05 3:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson re: Notice of Settlement14 .The Court has been advised by counsel that this matter has settled. The parties have ten (10) days from the date of this order or until the next scheduled court appearance, whichever is shorter, to file with the court a dismissal of the action or to appear, in-person or telephonically with their clients, to place the settlement on the record. (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Settlement
Thu 05/04 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Michael Rocca. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Fri 04/28 9:34 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),12 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: The proof of Service indicates that the summons was filed in the Los Angeles Superior Court, 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 and not the US District Court. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (shb) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 04/25 2:05 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Rocca, upon Defendant Laxmi Hospitality, LLC served on 4/13/2017, answer due 5/4/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rajesh Patel - Registered Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 04/04 10:08 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Rocca, upon Defendant Jayhal Family, Inc served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mahmood Kazemzadeh - Registered Agent for Service, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 04/03 11:22 AM
Effective April 10, 2017, Judge McDermott will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 630 on the 6th Floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 630 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mailbox located outside the Clerk's Office on the 1st Floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Fri 03/17 7:56 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Fri 03/17 7:42 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 5:04 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Jayhal Family, Inc, Laxmi Hospitality, LLC. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 5:02 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 5:02 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 10:13 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Michael Rocca. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 10:12 AM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Rocca, (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 10:12 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Rocca. (Hubbard, Scottlynn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 10:09 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19510353 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Michael Rocca. (Attorney Scottlynn J Hubbard, IV added to party Michael Rocca(pty:pla))(Hubbard, Scottlynn) |