Colony Insurance Company v. Palmer Temple Street Properties LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | Paul L Abrams |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02029 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 1:36 AM PDT |
Defendant
Geoffrey H. Palmer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Palmer Temple Street Properties
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Palmer Temple Street Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Colony Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 10/17 5:07 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Colony Insurance Company.(Charlston, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 09/27 10:50 AM
(IN CHAMBERS)- NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. THE COURT, having been notified by counsel that the above-entitled action has been settled on or about September 26, 201722 ; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is hereby removed from this Court's active caseload until further application by the parties or order of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file a proper stipulation for dismissal or a joint report detailing settlement status within 45 days and every quarter thereafter until a stipulation for dismissal is filed. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. All dates in this action are hereby VACATED. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Settlement
Tue 09/26 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendants Geoffrey H. Palmer. (Echeverria, Ricardo) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
3
pgs
order
Order Extending Answer Due Deadline
Tue 08/29 11:20 AM
ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Stipulation20 , IT IS ORDERED that the date for the responsive pleading to be filed by defendants herein is extended to and including 9/28/2017. (gk) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Fri 08/25 1:37 PM
Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 09/28/2017 re Amended Complaint/Petition,5 filed by Defendants Geoffrey H. Palmer.(Messner, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Fri 06/30 4:43 PM
ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING18 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. IT IS ORDERED: The date for the responsive pleading to be filed by defendants herein is extended to and including August 29, 2017. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Wed 06/28 3:30 PM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 28, 2017 re Amended Complaint/Petition,5 filed by Plaintiff Colony Insurance Company.(Charlston, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 06/21 3:48 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, (Messner, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
Wed 06/21 8:25 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond14 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Counsel shall re-file the Certification and Notice of Interested Parties as a separate docket entry. (iv) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Mon 06/19 8:38 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Respond14 . The following error(s) was found:Certification and Notice of Interested Parties submitted as a separate PDF attachment to this entry, and should have been docketed separately. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (iv) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 06/01 9:16 AM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Amended Complaint/Petition,5 filed by Defendants Geoffrey H. Palmer, Palmer Temple Street Properties, Palmer Temple Street Properties, LLC.(Attorney Steven Patrick Messner added to party Geoffrey H. Palmer(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Patrick Messner added to party Palmer Temple Street Properties(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Patrick Messner added to party Palmer Temple Street Properties, LLC(pty:dft))(Messner, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 05/24 10:38 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 04/20 5:30 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Colony Insurance Company. upon Palmer Temple Street Properties, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/29/2017, answer due 5/30/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Michael D. Collins, Attorney. (Charlston, Jeffrey) |
|
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 04/20 5:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Colony Insurance Company. upon Geoffrey H. Palmer waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/29/2017, answer due 5/30/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Michael D. Collins, Attorney. (Charlston, Jeffrey) |
|
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 04/20 5:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Colony Insurance Company. upon Palmer Temple Street Properties waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/29/2017, answer due 5/30/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Michael Collins, Attorney. (Charlston, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/24 2:14 PM
21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint5 as to Defendants Palmer Temple Street Properties, LLC, Palmer Temple Street Properties, and Geoffrey H. Palmer, individually and doing business as GH Palmer Associates. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/21 12:12 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,5 filed by PLAINTIFF Colony Insurance Company. (Charlston, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 11:26 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 11:25 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Tue 03/14 3:42 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Plaintiff Colony Insurance Company, a Virginia corporation amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , filed by Plaintiff Colony Insurance Company, a Virginia corporation(Charlston, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 2:59 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiff Colony Insurance Company, a Virginia corporation. (Charlston, Jeffrey) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 2:58 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Colony Insurance Company, a Virginia corporation, identifying Argo Group International Holdings, Ltd.. (Charlston, Jeffrey) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 2:55 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Colony Insurance Company, a Virginia corporation. (Charlston, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 2:53 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19513547 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Colony Insurance Company, a Virginia corporation. (Attorney Jeffrey Alan Charlston added to party Colony Insurance Company, a Virginia corporation(pty:pla))(Charlston, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint - Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint - Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Complaint - Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Complaint - Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Complaint - Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Complaint - Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Complaint - Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Complaint - Exhibit H |