Robert Stecher v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John A Kronstadt |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02030 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 1:56 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Stecher
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
51 | 51
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 02/15 10:29 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Pursuant to the stipulation this court hereby DISMISSES this action with prejudice. Each party to bear its own fees and costs. (bp) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
50 | 50
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 02/08 9:18 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Robert Stecher, re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))49 served on February 8, 2018. (Golden, Jeremy) |
|
49 | 49
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 02/08 9:17 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Robert Stecher. Dismissal is With Prejudice.(Golden, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |